AVANETTI et al v. PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY AVANETTI and BARBARA AVANETTI
Defendant: PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY and FARMERS AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv00611
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. SEE ORDER for additional instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/6/2021.(KAA)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING MOTION AS MOOT - On December 30, 2020, Plaintiff filed an amended complaint. Dkt. #12 . Defendants' motion to dismiss, dkt. #10 , is therefore DENIED without prejudice as moot (See Order). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/4/2021. (TMC)
December 30, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McDonald, James)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants FARMERS AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Davis, Grover)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants FARMERS AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Grover)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Thomas Flanigan on behalf of Defendants FARMERS AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Flanigan, James)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants FARMERS AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Davis, Grover)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FARMERS AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION. (Davis, Grover)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Davis, Grover)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to FARMERS AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (RAGS) (KAA)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (KAA)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Grover Burton Davis on behalf of Defendants FARMERS AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Davis, Grover)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vermillion Circuit Court, case number 83C01-2010-CT-000013, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6281119) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record (CCS and Complaint), #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Removal, #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Filing in State Court)(Davis, Grover)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AVANETTI et al v. PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY AVANETTI
Represented By: James O. McDonald
Represented By: John P. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA AVANETTI
Represented By: James O. McDonald
Represented By: John P. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Grover Burton Davis
Represented By: James Thomas Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARMERS AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Grover Burton Davis
Represented By: James Thomas Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?