CARTER v. BROWN
Plaintiff: ANTWION CARTER
Defendant: RICHARD BROWN
Case Number: 2:2020cv00614
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ANTWION CARTER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RECEIPT #IP072133 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $7.55, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket #5 resent to Plaintiff ANTWION CARTER 128406 at WABASH VALLEY - CF based on IDOC website. (TMC)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Mail Returned as undeliverable, Released 11-23-20. #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis sent to ANTWION CARTER, WVCF. (AAS)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Seven Dollars and Fifty-Five Cents ($7.55). The plaintiff shall have through December 30, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/3/2020. (KAA)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, ANTWION CARTER. (Attachments: #1 Certified Counselors Statement, Affidavit)(DJH)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD BROWN, filed by ANTWION CARTER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Report of Conduct, Report of Investigation, #2 Exhibit B Notices, Postponement, #3 Exhibit C Report of Disciplinary Hearing, Telephone Log, #4 Exhibit D Disciplinary Hearing Appeal, #5 Exhibit E IDOC decision, #6 Exhibit F Notice of Electronic Filing, excerpt of document, Modification of Visiting Privileges)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTER v. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTWION CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?