MONTGOMERY v. WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN et al
Petitioner: LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY
Respondent: MICHAEL CARVAJAL, JEFFREY ROSEN and WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN
Case Number: 2:2021cv00020
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 27 MANDATE of USCA as to #18 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, JEFFREY ROSEN, WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN (USCA #21-1052) - Because Montgomery has not overcome the strong presumption against last minute stays, Bucklew, 139 S. Ct. at 1134, and has not made a strong showing of a likelihood of success on her proposed Ford claim, Nken, 556 U.S. at 434, we vacate thedistrict court's stay of execution. (LBT)
January 13, 2021 Filing 26 Filed order from the Supreme Court re: 20A124. The application for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Barrett and by her referred to the Court is denied. (USCA #21-1052) (RSF)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER of USCA as to #18 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, JEFFREY ROSEN, WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN (USCA #21-1052) - We vacate the district court's stay of execution. Motion Granted; Stay Vacated. (RSF)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY - On January 11, 2021, the Court granted a motion to stay and entered an order staying Lisa Marie Montgomery's execution. Dkts. #17 , #22 . The government promptly filed a notice of appeal and an emergency motion to stay pending appeal. Dkt. #19 . As the government acknowledges, the Court has considered and rejected the arguments presented in their motion to stay. Id. at 1. For the reasons discussed in the Court's order granting a stay of execution, the government's emergency motion for stay pending appeal, dkt. #19 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/12/2021. (RSF)
January 12, 2021 Filing 23 USCA Case Number 21-1052 for #18 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, JEFFREY ROSEN, WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN. (RSF)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STAYING THE EXECUTION OF LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY: Counsel have demonstrated that a stay of Lisa Marie Montgomery's execution is warranted. It is therefore ordered that respondents Warden of the USP Terre Haute, IN, Michael Carvajal, and Jeffrey Rosen are enjoined from executing Lisa Marie Montgomery until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/12/2021. (PKP)
January 12, 2021 Filing 21 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #18 Notice of Appeal. - for Court of Appeals Use Only. (RSF)
January 12, 2021 Filing 20 PARTIES' SHORT RECORD re #18 Notice of Appeal - Instructions for Attorneys/Parties attached. (RSF)
January 11, 2021 Filing 19 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #17 Order on Motion to Stay , filed by Respondents MICHAEL CARVAJAL, JEFFREY ROSEN, WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN. (Casey, Brian)
January 11, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #17 Order on Motion to Stay, filed by Respondents MICHAEL CARVAJAL, JEFFREY ROSEN, WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Casey, Brian)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION PENDING A COMPETENCE HEARING - Petitioner Lisa Montgomery is scheduled to be executed tomorrow, January 12, 2021, at the United States Penitentiary in Terre Haute, Indiana (USP - Terre Haute). Ms. Montgomery has filed a petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 2241, alleging that she is incompetent to be executed under Ford v. Wainwright, 477 U.S. 399 (1986), and a motion to stay execution. Ms. Montgomery's motion to stay execution, dkt. #12 , is GRANTED to allow the Court to conduct a hearing to determine Ms. Montgomery's competence to be executed. The Court will set a time and date for the hearing in a separate order in due course. (See Order.) Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/11/2021. (RSF)
January 11, 2021 Filing 16 APPENDIX re #11 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Appendices G-J by LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY. (Attachments: #1 Appendix G - Kempke Declaration, #2 Appendix H - Harwell letter, #3 Appendix I - Henry letter, #4 Appendix J - Shields Declaration)(Henry, Kelley) Modified on 1/11/2021 - Created link to #15 (RSF).
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY TO RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION #14 , filed by Petitioner LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY. (Henry, Kelley) Modified on - updated title 1/11/2021 (RSF).
January 10, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS #11 AND MOTION FOR STAY #12 filed by Respondents MICHAEL CARVAJAL, JEFFREY ROSEN, WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN. (Casey, Brian) Modified on 1/11/2021 - updated title (RSF).
January 10, 2021 Filing 13 Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay Execution Pending Final Disposition of her Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #11 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Respondents MICHAEL CARVAJAL, JEFFREY ROSEN, WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cottrell Declaration Regarding Failure to Request Examination, #2 Exhibit B - Buckner Declaration Regarding Phone Calls, #3 Exhibit C - Dr. Pietz Declaration Regarding Professional Opinions, #4 Exhibit D - Dr. Wheat Declaration Regarding BOP Psychology Records, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpts from BOP Medical Records, #6 Exhibit F - Excerpts of Transcripts of Jail Calls from Lisa Montgomery, #7 Exhibit G - November Letter from Garrison to Henry Regarding Competency Claim, #8 Exhibit H - Winter Declaration Regarding Execution Logistics, #9 Exhibit I - Wear Declaration Regarding Authentication of BOP Records, #10 Exhibit J - January 7 Letter from Henry, #11 Exhibit K - January 8 Response from Hyle)(Casey, Brian)
January 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Execution Pending Final Disposition of her Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY. (Henry, Kelley)
January 9, 2021 Filing 11 Corrected Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Appendix Index, #3 Appendix 1 - Appendix Index, #4 Appendix B - Part 1 2255 Hearing Exhibits, #5 Appendix B - Part 2 2255 Hearing Exhibits, #6 Appendix B - Part 3 2255 Hearing Exhibits, #7 Appendix B - Part 4 2255 Hearing Exhibits, #8 Appendix C - Part 1 2255 Hearing Testimony Transcripts, #9 Appendix C - Part 2 2255 Hearing Testimony Transcripts, #10 Appendix D - Trial Testimony Transcripts, #11 Appendix E - Montgomery Medical Records, #12 Appendix F - Expert Declarations)(Henry, Kelley)
January 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Respondents (Casey, Brian) Modified on 1/9/2021 (RSF).
January 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Lisa Nouri for LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/9/2021. (RSF)
January 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - granting #3 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Amy D. Harwell for LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/9/2021. (RSF)
January 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - granting #2 Motion to Appear pro hac vice regarding Kelley J. Henry on behalf of Lisa Montgomery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/9/2021. (RSF)
January 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND DENYING AS MOOT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - Lisa Marie Montgomery is a federal inmate scheduled to be executed on January 12, 2021. She has filed a petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. The respondent shall have through 11:59 p.m. Eastern time on January 10, 2021, to respond to the petition (and any accompanying motion to stay). The petitioner shall have through noon Eastern time on January 11, 2021, to file a reply. The petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #4 , is DENIED as moot because the $5.00 filing fee has already been paid. The clerk is directed to provide notice to government counsel from Mrs. Montgomery's 28 U.S.C. 2255 litigation at the email addresses listed below. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/9/2021. (RSF)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lisa Nouri to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6358362), filed by Petitioner LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY. (Attachments: #1 1 - Proposed order)(Nouri, Lisa)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Petitioner LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY. (Attachments: #1 1 - Certification of Trust Fund)(Henry, Kelley)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Amy D. Harwell to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Petitioner LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proposed order)(Harwell, Amy)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kelley J. Henry to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Petitioner LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY. (Henry, Kelley)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 18 U.S.C 2241, filed by LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY. (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0756-6358336) (Attachments: #1 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, Kelley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTGOMERY v. WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL CARVAJAL
Represented By: Brian Patrick Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEFFREY ROSEN
Represented By: Brian Patrick Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN OF USP TERRE HAUTE, IN
Represented By: Brian Patrick Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LISA MARIE MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Kelley J. Henry
Represented By: Amy D. Harwell
Represented By: Lisa Nouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?