HILL v. COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT et al
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS HILL
Defendant: COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT, BRADLEY, BOP DIRECTOR, PROG. DIV. ASST. DIRECTOR, KRUGER, IAN CONNERS and ALL KNOWN AND UNKNOWN BOP STAFF
Case Number: 2:2021cv00110
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, filed by Plaintiff DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(AAS)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RECEIPT #NA004400 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $20.08, paid by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (TMC)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALL KNOWN AND UNKNOWN BOP STAFF, BOP DIRECTOR, BRADLEY, IAN CONNERS, COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT, KRUGER, PROG. DIV. ASST. DIRECTOR, filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(JRB)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DENYING MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, filed on November 5, 2019, dkt. #2 , is granted. The plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Twenty Dollars and Eight Cents ($20.08).He shall have through April 24, 2021, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, dkt. #9 , is denied without prejudice. The motion for equitable relief, dkt. #13 , is denied as premature as to the requests for a conference and defendants' responses. The motion, dkt. #13 , is granted to the extent that the clerk is directed to include a copy of the complaint, dkt. #1 , with the plaintiff's copy of this Order. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 1)(KAA)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DWH)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-04920. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Indiana (Terra Haute Division) the electronic record. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court transfers this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, Terre Haute Division, for consideration of Plaintiff's complaint #1 , application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ 2, 8], motion for preliminary relief #9 , motion for equitable relief #13 , and for whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. This case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case transferred. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/22/2021. Mailed notice(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Demetrius Hill for equitable relief. (Envelope postmarked 1/21/21; institution mail room 1/20/21) (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to to all parties of record. (bg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RECEIVED from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-03364 (bg) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of Illinois. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/18/2020. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/29/2020. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through K) (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DEMETRIUS HILL (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Plaintiff's #7 Response to the Court's March 9, 2020 Order #5 , the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff a second 30-day extension of time to submit a six-month trust account statement. All other provisions of the March 9, 2020 Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 5/27/20. (ms) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #5 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement,, filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (adh, ) "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 5/15/2020. [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to DEMETRIUS HILL; Type of Document Returned: ORDER. (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement (or institutional equivalent) or state in writing why he cannot do so and the length of time he expects to be unable to do so. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 03/06/2020. (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #3 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/20/2019. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEMETRIUS HILL (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(adh, ) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/5/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOP DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROG. DIV. ASST. DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRUGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAN CONNERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL KNOWN AND UNKNOWN BOP STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?