O'CONNOR et al v. JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC., et al
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE O'CONNOR, ARI SILBERMAN, AMANDA HAYS and EMILY THOMPSON
Defendant: LVI GLOBAL, LLC, D/B/A LAS VEGAS INSTITUTE, JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC., STEVE GALELLA, D.D.S., ORTHOMATRIX CORP., INC. ALSO D/B/A FACIAL BEAUTY INSTITUTE, LVI GLOBAL, LLC doing business as LAS VEGAS INSTITUTE and ORTHOMATRIX CORP., INC. doing business as FACIAL BEAUTY INSTITUTE
Case Number: 2:2021cv00374
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 24 Plaintiff's THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against STEVE GALELLA, D.D.S., JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC., ORTHOMATRIX CORP., INC., filed by AMANDA HAYS, ARI SILBERMAN, STEPHANIE O'CONNOR.(Milstein, Alan) Modified on 11/29/2021 to update docket title (TPS).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a Third Amended Complaint by December 6, 2021, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and previous Orders and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Because Plaintiffs must file a Third Amended Complaint, Defendant John's Laboratory, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #16 , which is directed at the First Amended Complaint, is DENIED without prejudice. Defendant John's Laboratory, Inc. may refile the motion, if appropriate, after the Third Amended Complaint is filed. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/15/2021. (KAA)
November 12, 2021 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended against STEVE GALELLA, D.D.S., JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC., LVI GLOBAL, LLC, ORTHOMATRIX CORP., INC., filed by AMANDA HAYS, ARI SILBERMAN, STEPHANIE O'CONNOR. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Milstein, Alan)
November 10, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Mullen on behalf of Defendant STEVE GALELLA, D.D.S.. (Mullen, Jessica)
November 10, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. O'Neill on behalf of Defendant STEVE GALELLA, D.D.S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
November 9, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by LVI GLOBAL, LLC. LVI GLOBAL, LLC waiver sent on 10/11/2021. (Mingus, Ronald)
November 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald A. Mingus on behalf of Defendant LVI GLOBAL, LLC. (Mingus, Ronald)
November 9, 2021 Filing 17 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC.. (Mead, John)
November 9, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mead, John)
November 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Feld on behalf of Defendant ORTHOMATRIX CORP., INC.. (Feld, Brian)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for a TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on December 7, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. (EST), before the Honorable Doris L. Pryor, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. SEE ORDER for further instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/28/2021.(KAA)
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC.. JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC. waiver sent on 10/11/2021. (Hahn, Richard)
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Andrew Hahn on behalf of Defendant JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC.. (Hahn, Richard)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Mead on behalf of Defendant JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC.. (Mead, John)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Plaintiffs have filed a First Amended Complaint in which they allege that this Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. Dkt. #9 . The Court notes the following issue with Plaintiffs' jurisdictional allegations: SEE ORDER. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a Second Amended Complaint by November 12, 2021 which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/18/2021.(KAA)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STEVE GALELLA, D.D.S., JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC., LVI GLOBAL, LLC, ORTHOMATRIX CORP., INC., filed by EMILY THOMPSON, STEPHANIE O'CONNOR, AMANDA HAYS, ARI SILBERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Milstein, Alan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Charnas on behalf of Plaintiffs AMANDA HAYS, STEPHANIE O'CONNOR, ARI SILBERMAN, EMILY THOMPSON. (Charnas, Scott)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiffs have filed a Complaint in which they allege that this Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. The Court notes the following issue with Plaintiffs' jurisdictional allegations: SEE ORDER. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint by October 18, 2021, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/4/2021.(KAA)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to STEVE GALELLA, D.D.S., JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC., LVI GLOBAL, LLC, ORTHOMATRIX CORP., INC.. (KAA)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan C. Milstein on behalf of Plaintiffs AMANDA HAYS, STEPHANIE O'CONNOR, ARI SILBERMAN, EMILY THOMPSON. (Milstein, Alan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (KAA)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 **PLEASE DISREGARD - DUPLICATE ENTRY IN ERROR** MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) Modified on 10/4/2021 (KAA).
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STEVE GALELLA, D.D.S., JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC., LVI GLOBAL, LLC, D/B/A LAS VEGAS INSTITUTE, ORTHOMATRIX CORP., INC. ALSO D/B/A FACIAL BEAUTY INSTITUTE, filed by AMANDA HAYS, ARI SILBERMAN, STEPHANIE O'CONNOR, EMILY THOMPSON. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6774254) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Milstein, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'CONNOR et al v. JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE O'CONNOR
Represented By: Alan C. Milstein
Represented By: Scott E. Charnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARI SILBERMAN
Represented By: Alan C. Milstein
Represented By: Scott E. Charnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA HAYS
Represented By: Alan C. Milstein
Represented By: Scott E. Charnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY THOMPSON
Represented By: Alan C. Milstein
Represented By: Scott E. Charnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVI GLOBAL, LLC, D/B/A LAS VEGAS INSTITUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN'S DENTAL LABORATORY, INC.
Represented By: John M. Mead
Represented By: Richard Andrew Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE GALELLA, D.D.S.
Represented By: Jessica L. Mullen
Represented By: Michael E. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHOMATRIX CORP., INC. ALSO D/B/A FACIAL BEAUTY INSTITUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVI GLOBAL, LLC doing business as LAS VEGAS INSTITUTE
Represented By: Ronald A. Mingus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHOMATRIX CORP., INC. doing business as FACIAL BEAUTY INSTITUTE
Represented By: Brian L. Feld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?