SHEPARD v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: JOSEPH W. SHEPARD
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 2:2021cv00470
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative records part 1, #3 administrative records part 2, #4 payment documents, #5 jurisdictional documents part 1, #6 jurisdictional records part 2, #7 jurisdictional documents part 3, #8 non disability related records part 1, #9 non disability related records part 2, #10 non disability related records part 3, #11 non disability related records part 4, #12 disability related records part 1, #13 disability related records part 2, #14 medical records part 1, #15 medical records part 2)(Wierenga, Julian)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Wierenga, Julian)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/30/2021. (TPS)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (TPS)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Maria de la Torre on behalf of Plaintiff JOSEPH W. SHEPARD. (de la Torre, Adriana)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff JOSEPH W. SHEPARD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(de la Torre, Adriana)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by JOSEPH W. SHEPARD. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(de la Torre, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEPARD v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH W. SHEPARD
Represented By: Adriana Maria de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?