LIVINGSTON v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER S. LIVINGSTON
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 2:2022cv00031
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - Plaintiff seeks judicial review of Defendant Commissioner's denial of Plaintiff's claim for Social Security benefits based on disability. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court now enters the following orders. Briefing Schedule: SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/25/2022.(KAA)
March 24, 2022 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative records, #3 payment records, #4 jurisdictional documents part 1, #5 jurisdictional documents part 2, #6 jurisdictional records part 3, #7 non disability related records, #8 disability related records, #9 medical records part 1, #10 medical records part 2, #11 medical records part 3, #12 medical records part 4, #13 medical records part 5)(Wierenga, Julian)
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Wierenga, Julian)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/26/2022. (TPS)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (TPS)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Thomas Lavella on behalf of Plaintiff ALEXANDER S. LIVINGSTON. (Lavella, Nicholas)
January 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Frederick Richter on behalf of Plaintiff ALEXANDER S. LIVINGSTON. (Richter, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff ALEXANDER S. LIVINGSTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by ALEXANDER S. LIVINGSTON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIVINGSTON v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER S. LIVINGSTON
Represented By: Nicholas Thomas Lavella
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?