GRAU v. KALLIS et al
Plaintiff: DAVE GRAU and DALE A. GRAU
Defendant: STEVE KALLIS and LINDA DAVIS
Case Number: 2:2022cv00382
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LINDA DAVIS, STEVE KALLIS, filed by DALE A. GRAU. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TPS)
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE to the Court, filed by Plaintiff DALE A. GRAU (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (TPS)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Dismissing Complaint and Directing Filing of Amended Complaint - Mr. Grau's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is GRANTED. He shall have through October 12, 2022, to pay an initial partial filing fee of Seven Dollars and Fifty Cents ($7.50). In addition, Mr. Grau's complaint has been screened as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915A and is DISMISSED. The clerk is directed to include a copy of the prisoner civil rights complaint form along with the plaintiff's copy of this Order. He will have through October 12, 2022, to file an amended complaint. Failure to take either of these steps may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. (SEE ORDER.) Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Blank Complaint Form) (TPS)
September 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (MEH)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
September 1, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DAVE GRAU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(TPS)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LINDA DAVIS, STEVE KALLIS, filed by DAVE GRAU. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TPS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAU v. KALLIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVE GRAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE A. GRAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE KALLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?