VAUGHN et al v. PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. et al
Plaintiff: ANGELA F VAUGHN and SARITA DAUGHERTY
Defendant: PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. and HEATHER STEINMULLER
Case Number: 2:2022cv00561
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2023. Discovery due by 11/3/2023. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/23/2023. (GD)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference. The telephonic initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 24, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. [Dkt. #17 ] is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/23/2023.(TPS)
January 20, 2023 Filing 18 First MOTION for Continuance Scheduling Conference, filed by Plaintiffs SARITA DAUGHERTY, ANGELA F VAUGHN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Continue Scheduling Conference)(Faultless, Scott)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2023 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. (SEE ORDER.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/17/2023.(TPS)
January 13, 2023 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs SARITA DAUGHERTY, ANGELA F VAUGHN . (Faultless, Scott)
January 11, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Additional Defenses, filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P..(Sorrell, Justin)
December 15, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE Plaintiffs Response to Defendant's Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiffs SARITA DAUGHERTY, ANGELA F VAUGHN. (Faultless, Scott)
December 13, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by HEATHER STEINMULLER.(Boyll, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Boyll on behalf of Defendant HEATHER STEINMULLER. (Boyll, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.. (Sorrell, Justin)
December 8, 2022 Filing 10 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (TPS)
December 8, 2022 Filing 9 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (TPS)
December 8, 2022 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
December 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Craig on behalf of Plaintiffs SARITA DAUGHERTY, ANGELA F VAUGHN. (Craig, David)
December 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Anthony Faultless on behalf of Plaintiffs SARITA DAUGHERTY, ANGELA F VAUGHN. (Faultless, Scott)
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.. (Sorrell, Justin)
December 7, 2022 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. identifying Other Affiliate PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION, Other Affiliate PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC., Other Affiliate PTL GP, LLC, Other Affiliate LJ VP Holdings, LLC for PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P... (Sorrell, Justin)
December 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah MacGill Marr on behalf of Defendant PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.. (Marr, Sarah)
December 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Owen Sorrell on behalf of Defendant PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.. (Sorrell, Justin)
December 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vigo County Superior Court Number One, case number 84D01-2211-CT-006982, filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7401590) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (State Ct Docket, Appearance, Complaint, Jury Trial Demand, Summons to Penske, Summons to Steinmuller, Cert of Issuance to Steinmuller, Cert of Issuance to Penske, Alias Summons to Steinmuller), #2 Exhibit B- Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sorrell, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAUGHN et al v. PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA F VAUGHN
Represented By: Christopher M. Barry
Represented By: Patrick Jacob Kotter
Represented By: Scott Anthony Faultless
Represented By: Whitney Lee Coker
Represented By: William J. Kelley
Represented By: David W. Craig
Represented By: Alexander Ryan Craig
Represented By: Samantha Christine Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARITA DAUGHERTY
Represented By: Alexander Ryan Craig
Represented By: Christopher M. Barry
Represented By: David W. Craig
Represented By: Patrick Jacob Kotter
Represented By: Samantha Christine Craig
Represented By: Scott Anthony Faultless
Represented By: Whitney Lee Coker
Represented By: William J. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.
Represented By: Justin Owen Sorrell
Represented By: Sarah MacGill Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER STEINMULLER
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Boyll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?