SCOTT-MANNA v. CENTURION et al
Plaintiff: AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA
Defendant: CENTURION, CLARKE, KERIS, SIMS, KYLEIGH INGALLS, JACK HENDRICKS, JAMES BASINGER, BOBBI RIGGS, MIKAYLA WILLIS and BYRD
Case Number: 2:2024cv00097
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Filing 16 FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. The action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/29/2024. (JSR)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT - It has come to the Court's attention that this civil action filed on March 19, 2024, is duplicative of the claims raised in Scott-Manna v. Indiana Department of Correction, No. 2:24-cv-00087-JPH-MJD, filed on March 11, 2024. This action is dismissed without prejudice as duplicative. Judgment consistent with this Order shall now issue. Given this Order, Plaintiff's motions at dkts. #10 , #12 , #13 , and #14 are denied as moot. Plaintiff is no longer required to file a response to this Court's April 9, 2024, Order (at dkt. #9 ) that invited him to file a complaint. The Plaintiff's motion for new therapist and motion to appoint counsel raise serious concerns about Plaintiff's health. Given the serious nature of these allegations, the clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order and Plaintiff's filings at dkts. #12 and #13 to the Warden of Wabash Valley Correctional Facility. (See Order.) Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/29/2024. Copies to Warden of Wabash Valley C.F. via US mail. (Attachments: #1 Dkt. 12, #2 Dkt. 13) (JSR)
April 22, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend and Withdraw Defendant, filed by Plaintiff AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TPS)
April 22, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TPS)
April 16, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA located at WVCF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (TPS)
April 15, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for New Therapist, filed by Plaintiff AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TPS)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - Ahkeem Scott-Manna has filed a motion for preliminary injunction with the Court. Dkt. #1 . However, he has not filed a complaint. The filing of the preliminary injunction motion alone is insufficient to begin a civil action. The Court will allow Mr. Scott-Manna until May 1, 2024, to file a complaint in this cause of action. If the Court does not receive a complaint by that date, the action may be dismissed without further notice. The clerk is directed to send Mr. Scott-Manna a copy of the Court's Prisoner Civil Complaint Form with a copy of this Order. The Court also notes that Mr. Scott- Manna has filed two motions to proceed without prepaying the filing fee in this case. However, he has not utilized the Court's form for requesting to do so and has instead written letters and submitted an Indiana state court form that do not include the information necessary to evaluate his motions. Mr. Scott-Manna's motions, dkts. #2 and #3 , are denied as presented. The Court will reconsider the request to proceed in forma pauperis if Mr. Scott-Manna files a complaint and submits the appropriate form. The clerk is directed to send a copy of the Court's Motion to Proceed Without Prepaying the Filing Fee form with a copy of this Order. Mr. Scott-Manna has filed a motion to amend or correct his complaint. That motion, dkt. #5 , is denied, because as noted no complaint has been filed in this case. SEE ORDER. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 04/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form, #2 IFP Form) (AAT)
April 8, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Court to Forward all Pending Filings to the Court in Terre Haute, filed by Plaintiff AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KAA)
March 28, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (MEH)
March 25, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH)
March 25, 2024 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 21, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)
March 21, 2024 Filing 3 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits including Certified Counselors Statement Of Inmate Trust Fund Account, Affidavit of Special Circumstances, Resident Activity Report, Request For Remittance, #2 Envelope)(DJH) Modified on 3/25/2024 ('supplemental' added) (DJH).
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits including Certified Counselors Statement Of Inmate Trust Fund Account, Affidavit of Special Circumstances, Resident Activity Report, Request For Remittance, #2 Envelope)(DJH)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE To The Court, filed by Plaintiff AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (DJH)
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMES BASINGER, BYRD, CENTURION, CLARKE, JACK HENDRICKS, KYLEIGH INGALLS, KERIS, BOBBI RIGGS, SIMS, MIKAYLA WILLIS, filed by AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT-MANNA v. CENTURION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHKEEM SCOTT-MANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLEIGH INGALLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK HENDRICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BASINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOBBI RIGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKAYLA WILLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?