STOVALL v. VANIHEL et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL C. STOVALL
Defendant: VANIHEL, BOBBIE RIGGS, BURD, WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY and BYRD
Case Number: 2:2024cv00144
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Court Assistance Regarding Payments, filed by Plaintiff DANIEL C. STOVALL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AJG)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of DANIEL C. STOVALL, 961380. As of the issuance of this Order, the balance of the filing fee still due in this case is $272.31. A copy of this Order shall be sent to plaintiff and to plaintiff's custodian. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/6/2024 (Copies mailed per distribution list).(LBT)
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 RECEIPT #10181 for Initial Partial Filing fee in the amount of $31.60, paid by Wanda L. Williams on behalf of DANIEL C. STOVALL. (CCG)
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 RECEIPT #10181 for Initial Partial Filing fee in the amount of $46.09, paid by Wanda L. Williams on behalf of DANIEL C. STOVALL. (CCG)
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail). (JRT)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Forty-Six Dollars and Nine Cents ($46.09). The plaintiff shall have through May 22, 2024, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. (See Order.) Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/23/2024. (JSR)
April 22, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (CCG)
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (CCG)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DANIEL C. STOVALL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CCG)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BURD, BOBBIE RIGGS, VANIHEL, WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, filed by DANIEL C. STOVALL. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOVALL v. VANIHEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL C. STOVALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANIHEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOBBIE RIGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?