EVANSVILLE GREENWAY AND REMEDIATION TRUST v. VECTREN CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: |
EVANSVILLE GREENWAY AND REMEDIATION TRUST |
Defendant: |
VECTREN CORPORATION and PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION |
Case Number: |
3:2007cv00066 |
Filed: |
May 21, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Evansville Office |
County: |
Vanderburgh |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Hussmann |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard L. Young |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 9607 Real Property Tort to Land |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 23, 2012 |
Filing
947
ORDER granting 918 Motion for Attorney Fees - The overall award is set at the adjusted level of $361,273.58. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/23/2012. (SMD)
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing
898
ORDER denying as moot 663 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 665 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 675 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 676 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 762 Mo tion in Limine; denying as moot 776 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 790 Motion to Strike the Supplemental Rebuttal Report of Marcia Williams; denying as moot 792 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 793 Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. L owenbach; denying as moot 805 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 807 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 809 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 812 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 813 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 817 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 818 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Marcia Williams; and granting 888 Motion to Approve Settlement. There is no just reason for delay and this Order therefore constitutes a final, appealable judgment as to the claims resolved herein. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/20/2010. (SMD)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
895
ORDER denying 784 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/16/2010. (SMD)
|
August 10, 2010 |
Filing
882
ORDER granting 578 Motion for Approval of Negotiated Settlement and; denying as moot 821 Inquiry Re Status of Ruling on Pending Motion for Approval of Negotiated Settlements. The Settlement Agreements should be maintained in the Court's file under seal. The Settlors are dismissed from this action with prejudice. This Order constitutes a final, appealable judgment as to the claims against the Settlors. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/10/2010. (SMD)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing
723
ORDER denying 629 Motion to Compel; denying 632 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 2/26/2010. (NRN)
|
September 29, 2009 |
Filing
530
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 388 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 425 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 474 Motion for Leave to File Response to SIGECO's surreply; denying 491 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Third Party Complaint ; granting 200 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 226 Motion to Strike Jury Trial Demand. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 9/29/2009. (SMD)
|
June 9, 2009 |
Filing
452
ORDER granting 417 Motion to Compel and denying 438 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr on 6/9/2009. (TMD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?