SEAY v. THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE et al
Plaintiff: ALEXIS SEAY
Defendant: TRACEY FOLDEN, THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE, R. SCOTT LANK and THOMAS KAZEE
Case Number: 3:2018cv00147
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Evansville Office
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Continuance , filed by Plaintiff ALEXIS SEAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordes, Lindsay)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Amend #15 Minute Entry - The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall have up to and including October 29, 2018, to file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/27/2018. (JRB)
September 25, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct Minute Order (Doc No 15), filed by Defendants TRACEY FOLDEN, THOMAS KAZEE, R. SCOTT LANK, THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McAnulty, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 09:30 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/19/2018.(JRB)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Telephone Conference held on 9/13/2018. Parties were represented by counsel. Plaintiff orally withdraws its objections to Defendants' Motions for Extensions of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (Docket No. #9 and Docket No. #14 ); after which, the Court GRANTS both motions. The deadline for Defendants, The University of Evansville, Thomas Kazee, Tracey Folden, and R. Scott Lank to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended up to and including October 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to October 12, 2018 in which to #1 Complaint Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant R. SCOTT LANK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Sacha)
September 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sacha L. Armstrong on behalf of Defendant R. SCOTT LANK. (Armstrong, Sacha)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Motion for Emergency Hearing on its Motion for Initial Extension of Time- TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE is set for SEPTEMBER 13, 2018 at 2:00 p.m., Evansville time (CST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/12/2018.(JRB) Modified on 9/12/2018 (JRB).
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Emergency Hearing on its Motion for Initial Extension of Time, filed by Defendants TRACEY FOLDEN, THOMAS KAZEE, THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Setting Hearing on Motion for Expedited Hearing)(Goldman, Jon)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 12, 2018 , filed by Defendants TRACEY FOLDEN, THOMAS KAZEE, THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Defendants Motion for Initial Extension of Time)(Goldman, Jon)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Mount Roelle on behalf of Defendants TRACEY FOLDEN, THOMAS KAZEE, THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE. (Roelle, Carrie)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. McAnulty on behalf of Defendants TRACEY FOLDEN, THOMAS KAZEE, THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE. (McAnulty, Mark)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon D. Goldman on behalf of Defendants TRACEY FOLDEN, THOMAS KAZEE, THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE. (Goldman, Jon)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Cordes on behalf of Plaintiff ALEXIS SEAY. (Cordes, Lindsay)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tad Thomas on behalf of Plaintiff ALEXIS SEAY. (Thomas, Tad)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TRACEY FOLDEN, THOMAS KAZEE, R. SCOTT LANK, THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE. (JRB)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ALEXIS SEAY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5024870) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomas, Tad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEAY v. THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACEY FOLDEN
Represented By: Carrie Mount Roelle
Represented By: Jon D. Goldman
Represented By: Mark A. McAnulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNIVERSITY OF EVANSVILLE
Represented By: Carrie Mount Roelle
Represented By: Jon D. Goldman
Represented By: Mark A. McAnulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. SCOTT LANK
Represented By: Sacha L. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS KAZEE
Represented By: Carrie Mount Roelle
Represented By: Jon D. Goldman
Represented By: Mark A. McAnulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIS SEAY
Represented By: Tad Thomas
Represented By: Lindsay Cordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?