CRAWFORD v. GARDNER et al

Plaintiff: SHERRY CRAWFORD
Defendant: FGM LOGISTICS, LLC and DEVIN GARDNER
Case Number: 3:2018cv00181
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants FGM LOGISTICS, LLC, DEVIN GARDNER. (Pollack, Caren)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Pollack, Caren)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 10:30 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/31/2018.(JRB)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Caren L. Pollack on behalf of Defendant DEVIN GARDNER. (Pollack, Caren)
October 8, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by SHERRY CRAWFORD. FGM LOGISTICS, LLC served on 9/27/2018. (Winingham, William)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FGM LOGISTICS, LLC. (Pollack, Caren)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to FGM LOGISTICS, LLC. (LAB) (JRB)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant FGM LOGISTICS, LLC. (Pollack, Caren)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Caren L. Pollack on behalf of Defendant FGM LOGISTICS, LLC. (Pollack, Caren)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FGM LOGISTICS, LLC and DEVIN GARDNER. (JRB)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon Noyes on behalf of Plaintiff SHERRY CRAWFORD. (Noyes, Jonathon)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff SHERRY CRAWFORD. (Winingham, William)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Winingham on behalf of Plaintiff SHERRY CRAWFORD. (Winingham, William)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by SHERRY CRAWFORD. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5074100) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Winingham, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRAWFORD v. GARDNER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FGM LOGISTICS, LLC
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVIN GARDNER
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY CRAWFORD
Represented By: Jonathon Noyes
Represented By: William E. Winingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?