WRIGHT et al v. PROCTOR et al

Plaintiff: KATHY DIANE WRIGHT and DONALD EUGENE WRIGHT
Defendant: LANCE M. PROCTOR and PAULA A. PROCTOR
Case Number: 3:2018cv00189
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by LANCE M. PROCTOR, PAULA A. PROCTOR.(Freyberger, Greg)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 11:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/9/2018.(JRB) Modified on 11/15/2018 (JRB).
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants LANCE M. PROCTOR, PAULA A. PROCTOR. (Freyberger, Greg)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg J. Freyberger on behalf of Defendants LANCE M. PROCTOR, PAULA A. PROCTOR. (Freyberger, Greg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by DONALD EUGENE WRIGHT, KATHY DIANE WRIGHT as to PAULA A. PROCTOR. (Moore, Charles)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by DONALD EUGENE WRIGHT, KATHY DIANE WRIGHT as to LANCE M. PROCTOR. (Moore, Charles)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Charles E. Moore for DONALD EUGENE WRIGHT,Charles E. Moore for KATHY DIANE WRIGHT added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/10/2018. (JRB)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Moore on behalf of Plaintiffs DONALD EUGENE WRIGHT, KATHY DIANE WRIGHT. (Moore, Charles)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Charles E. Moore to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5099782), filed by Plaintiffs DONALD EUGENE WRIGHT, KATHY DIANE WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Charles)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LANCE M. PROCTOR and PAULA A. PROCTOR. (JRB)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LANCE M. PROCTOR, PAULA A. PROCTOR, filed by DONALD EUGENE WRIGHT, KATHY DIANE WRIGHT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5098978) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Moore, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT et al v. PROCTOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCE M. PROCTOR
Represented By: Greg J. Freyberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULA A. PROCTOR
Represented By: Greg J. Freyberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY DIANE WRIGHT
Represented By: Charles Edward Moore
Represented By: Charles E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD EUGENE WRIGHT
Represented By: Charles Edward Moore
Represented By: Charles E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?