HENNINGS v. HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS, INC.

Plaintiff: LARRY HENNINGS
Defendant: HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00219
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
0 Judge: Matthew P Brookman
1 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff LARRY HENNINGS. (Sullivan, Chad)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff LARRY HENNINGS. (Sullivan, Chad)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #6 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim , filed by LARRY HENNINGS.(Sullivan, Chad)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff LARRY HENNINGS. (Sullivan, Chad)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Counterclaim to 1/11/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/3/2019. (JRB)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to January 11, 2019 in which to #6 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim , filed by Counter Defendant LARRY HENNINGS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Chad)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/19/2018.(JRB)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS, INC.. (Miles, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS, INC.. (LAB) (JRB)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 Hawthorne Family Farms ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against LARRY HENNINGS, filed by HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Compulsory Counter Claim, #2 Index For Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Appearance)(Miles, Robert)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by LARRY HENNINGS. HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS, INC. served on 11/17/2018. (Sullivan, Chad)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS, INC. (JRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad J. Sullivan on behalf of Plaintiff Larry Henning. (Sullivan, Chad)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, UNJUST ENRICHMENT, BREACH OF LEASE, CONVERSION, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Hawthorne Family Farms, Inc., filed by Larry Henning. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5156024) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease, #2 Exhibit B - Addendum, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Sullivan, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENNINGS v. HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Robert T. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY HENNINGS
Represented By: Chad J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?