SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. KUHNASH et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: KEVIN R. KUHNASH and JASON P. JIMMERSON
Intervenor: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00028
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Intervene - The above-captioned case is STAYED in its entirety until the conclusion of all related criminal litigation, i.e., United States v. Kuhnash et al., 3:18-cr-00078-RLY-MPB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/15/2019. (JRB)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. DeBrota on behalf of Intervenor UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (DeBrota, Steven)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Linder on behalf of Intervenor UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Linder, Nicholas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene and Stay, filed by Intervenor UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Linder, Nicholas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 ***PLEASE DISREGARD REFER TO #16 ***NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Linder on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Linder, Nicholas) Modified on 3/4/2019 (MAC). Modified on 3/5/2019 (MAC).
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION. KEVIN R. KUHNASH waiver sent on 2/21/2019. (Leiman, Timothy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Riley H. Floyd on behalf of Defendant JASON P. JIMMERSON. (Floyd, Riley)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hensel on behalf of Defendant JASON P. JIMMERSON. (Hensel, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Shank on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Shank, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION. JASON P. JIMMERSON waiver sent on 2/20/2019. (Leiman, Timothy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jake A. Schmidt on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Schmidt, Jake)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to JASON P. JIMMERSON, KEVIN R. KUHNASH. (JRB)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to JASON P. JIMMERSON. (Leiman, Timothy)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to KEVIN R. KUHNASH. (Leiman, Timothy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Stewart Leiman on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Leiman, Timothy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Moye on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Moye, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Moye, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. KUHNASH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Timothy Stewart Leiman
Represented By: Robert M. Moye
Represented By: Nicholas J. Linder
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Shank
Represented By: Jake A. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN R. KUHNASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON P. JIMMERSON
Represented By: David J. Hensel
Represented By: Riley H. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Nicholas J. Linder
Represented By: Steven D. DeBrota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?