ZAMBRANO v. BRANCHVILLE CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

Petitioner: JOSE ZAMBRANO
Respondent: BRANCHVILLE CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00032
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Respondent's Notice of 42-day Extension of Deadline to File a Return to Order Show Cause, filed by BRANCHVILLE CORRECTIONAL FACILITY. Return to Order to Show Cause deadline is 5/24/2019. (Craft, Aaron)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Recker on behalf of Respondent BRANCHVILLE CORRECTIONAL FACILITY. (Recker, Abigail)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIPT #EV6647 for FIling Fee fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by Jose Zambrano. (JRB)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) - Jose Zambrano's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges his disciplinary conviction in disciplinary case number BTC 18-11-0064 on November 20, 2018. The petitioner shall have through March 29, 2019, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 4/12/2019. Copy sent to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/1/2019.(JRB)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JOSE ZAMBRANO. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(JRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZAMBRANO v. BRANCHVILLE CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE ZAMBRANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BRANCHVILLE CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Represented By: Abigail Recker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?