POLLARD-SHILLINGFORD v. UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN INDIANA et al

Plaintiff: ZINDA POLLARD-SHILLINGFORD
Defendant: SAMANTHA SAWYER, AMY WILSON and UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN INDIANA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00057
Filed: March 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00088. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Indiana the electronic record. (nsf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 2/28/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff(ntf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. The case is terminated on this Court's docket. [For further details see order.] Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/28/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Order #11 and judgment #12 entered 2/28/19 were entered in error and are vacated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 2/28/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Plaintiff's amended complaint #10 is dismissed, without prejudice to refiling the complaint, along with any accompanying in forma pauperis application, in the Southern District of Indiana. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/28/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Zinda Pollard-Shillingford. (Exhibits) (nsf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
February 8, 2019 MAILED a blank amended complaint with a copy of the Order dated 2/7/2019 to the Plaintiff. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff Zinda Pollard-Shillingford, pro se, seeks permission to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") in this suit. Because plaintiff does not have sufficient assets to pay the filing fee, her IFP application #4 is granted. However, plaintiffs allegations are not sufficient to survive this Court's initial screening, so the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by March 1, 2019, if she can cure the defects identified in this order and state a claim in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #5 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/7/2019. Mailed notice(jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Zinda Pollard-Shillingford for attorney representation (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Zinda Pollard-Shillingford for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Zinda Pollard-Shillingford (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and three (3) copies by Zinda Pollard-Shillingford (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POLLARD-SHILLINGFORD v. UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN INDIANA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMANTHA SAWYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZINDA POLLARD-SHILLINGFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?