WHITEHEAD v. SAUL

Plaintiff: KIMANNA WHITEHEAD
Defendant: NANCY BERRYHILL and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 3:2019cv00071
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Brief in Support of Complaint for Judicial Review by KIMANNA WHITEHEAD. (Krowl, William)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Within twenty-eight (28) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of the complaint. Within twenty-eight (28) days after service of Plaintiff's brief, Defendant shall file a brief in response. Within fourteen (14) days after service of Defendant's opposition brief, Plaintiff will file his/her reply brief, if any. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/4/2019.(JRB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by NANCY BERRYHILL. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative documents, #3 payment documents, #4 jurisdictional documents, #5 non disability related documents, #6 disability related documents, #7 medical records part 1, #8 medical records part 2, #9 medical records part 3, #10 medical records part 4, #11 medical records part 5, #12 medical records part 6, #13 medical records part 7, #14 medical records part 8)(Wierenga, Julian)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge - This case is referred to the currently assigned United States magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of final judgment. Please use updated case number 3:19-cv-71-MPB-RLY on all future filings. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/26/2019.(JRB)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by NANCY BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant NANCY BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, [Filing No. #3 ], is GRANTED. Immediate payment is not required. However, the $350 balance remains owing. (See Entry.) Copy via U.S. Mail pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/4/2019. (DMW)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff KIMANNA WHITEHEAD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krowl, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William Martain Krowl on behalf of Plaintiff KIMANNA WHITEHEAD. (Krowl, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY BERRYHILL, filed by KIMANNA WHITEHEAD. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krowl, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITEHEAD v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMANNA WHITEHEAD
Represented By: William Martain Krowl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?