LITTLE SANDY COAL COMPANY, INC. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: LITTLE SANDY COAL COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00103
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Strandjord, James)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Mark Strandjord on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Strandjord, James)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jefferson H. Read for LITTLE SANDY COAL COMPANY, INC. added. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/20/2019. (JRB)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jeremy M. Fingeret for LITTLE SANDY COAL COMPANY, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/20/2019. (JRB)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jefferson H. Read to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5487446), filed by Plaintiff LITTLE SANDY COAL COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Crandley, Mark)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeremy M. Fingeret to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5487433), filed by Plaintiff LITTLE SANDY COAL COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crandley, Mark)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/13/2019.(JRB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Taylor Kirklin on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Kirklin, Jackson)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (JRB)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Little Sandy Coal Company, Inc.. (Crandley, Mark)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Jason Crandley on behalf of Plaintiff Little Sandy Coal Company, Inc.. (Crandley, Mark)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Little Sandy Coal Company, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5433735) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Crandley, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LITTLE SANDY COAL COMPANY, INC. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: James Mark Strandjord
Represented By: Jackson Taylor Kirklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LITTLE SANDY COAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Mark Jason Crandley
Represented By: Jeremy M. Fingeret
Represented By: Jefferson H. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?