CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. BESING et al

Plaintiff: CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: DARVIN MCCALLISTER, HUEBNER TRUCKING CO. INC., LARRY A. SNYDER, REBECCA L. HELFERT, KELLY J. BESING, CHUCK E. MONTZ, RJH TRUCKING INC, SHELTER INSURANCE COMPANIES, LINDA SUE HALL, JAMES D. KEY, ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, O.K. GROUP CORP., GLENN MORRIS, CIRCLE J TRUCKING LLC and JOHN K. JOHNSON
Case Number: 3:2019cv00110
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by HUEBNER TRUCKING CO. INC., RJH TRUCKING INC.(Rudolph, Ross)
July 17, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by CIRCLE J TRUCKING LLC, JOHN K. JOHNSON.(Freel, Angela)
July 17, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Interpleader, filed by CHUCK E. MONTZ.(Anderson, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by SHELTER INSURANCE COMPANIES.(Hoffman, Douglas)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 11:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/16/2019.(JRB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT, re #29 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to LINDA SUE HALL, JAMES D. KEY, GLENN MORRIS, O.K. GROUP CORP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Clerk, Laura A. Briggs. (JRB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(O'Brien, Edward)
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiff CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Neal Anderson on behalf of Defendant CHUCK E. MONTZ. (Anderson, Edward)
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Ross on behalf of Plaintiff CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Ross, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Hensleigh Thomas on behalf of Defendants KELLY J. BESING and REBECCA L. HELFERT. (Thomas, Stephen) Modified on 7/3/2019 (JRB).
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LARRY A. SNYDER. (Wallitsch, Scott)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Wallitsch on behalf of Defendant LARRY A. SNYDER. (Wallitsch, Scott)
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by KELLY J. BESING.(Thomas, Noah)
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Cartwright Thomas on behalf of Defendant KELLY J. BESING. (Thomas, Noah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIRCLE J TRUCKING LLC, JOHN K. JOHNSON. (Freel, Angela)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUEBNER TRUCKING CO. INC.. (Rudolph, Ross)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RJH TRUCKING INC. (Rudolph, Ross)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants HUEBNER TRUCKING CO. INC., RJH TRUCKING INC. (Rudolph, Ross)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross E. Rudolph on behalf of Defendants HUEBNER TRUCKING CO. INC., RJH TRUCKING INC. (Rudolph, Ross)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to CIRCLE J TRUCKING LLC. (LAB) (JRB)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. O'Brien on behalf of Defendant ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Brien, Edward)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Brien, Edward)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Brien, Edward)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHELTER INSURANCE COMPANIES. (Hoffman, Douglas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants CIRCLE J TRUCKING LLC, JOHN K. JOHNSON. (Freel, Angela)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela L. Freel on behalf of Defendants CIRCLE J TRUCKING LLC, JOHN K. JOHNSON. (Freel, Angela)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to SHELTER INSURANCE COMPANIES. (LAB) (JRB)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant SHELTER INSURANCE COMPANIES. (Hoffman, Douglas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Alan Hoffman on behalf of Defendant SHELTER INSURANCE COMPANIES. (Hoffman, Douglas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Keen, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (LAB) (JRB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, KELLY J. BESING, CIRCLE J TRUCKING LLC, LINDA SUE HALL, REBECCA L. HELFERT, HUEBNER TRUCKING CO. INC., JOHN K. JOHNSON, JAMES D. KEY, DARVIN MCCALLISTER, CHUCK E. MONTZ, GLENN MORRIS, O.K. GROUP CORP., RJH TRUCKING INC, SHELTER INSURANCE COMPANIES, LARRY A. SNYDER. (JRB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Keen, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Keen, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants, filed by CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5443671) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - INSURANCE POLICY, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Keen, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. BESING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARVIN MCCALLISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUEBNER TRUCKING CO. INC.
Represented By: Ross E. Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY A. SNYDER
Represented By: Scott A. Wallitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA L. HELFERT
Represented By: Stephen Hensleigh Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY J. BESING
Represented By: Noah Cartwright Thomas
Represented By: Stephen Hensleigh Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUCK E. MONTZ
Represented By: Edward Neal Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJH TRUCKING INC
Represented By: Ross E. Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELTER INSURANCE COMPANIES
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA SUE HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES D. KEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Edward M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.K. GROUP CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRCLE J TRUCKING LLC
Represented By: Angela L. Freel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN K. JOHNSON
Represented By: Angela L. Freel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert T. Keen, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?