DURCHOLZ v. FASTOP INC.
Plaintiff: JAYD DURCHOLZ
Defendant: FASTOP INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00126
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by FASTOP INC..(Buckley Minix, Melissa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Berger on behalf of Plaintiff JAYD DURCHOLZ. (Berger, Lauren)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE -TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on SEPTEMBER 13, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., Evansville time (CST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed for counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/9/2019.(JRB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FASTOP INC.. (Buckley Minix, Melissa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant FASTOP INC.. (Buckley Minix, Melissa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Buckley Minix on behalf of Defendant FASTOP INC.. (Buckley Minix, Melissa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Gruber on behalf of Defendant FASTOP INC.. (Gruber, Andrew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by JAYD DURCHOLZ. FASTOP INC. served on 6/26/2019. (Biesecker, Kyle)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FASTOP INC.. (JRB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Frederick Biesecker on behalf of Plaintiff JAYD DURCHOLZ. (Biesecker, Kyle)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against FASTOP INC., filed by JAYD DURCHOLZ. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5492037) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Biesecker, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DURCHOLZ v. FASTOP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FASTOP INC.
Represented By: Andrew W. Gruber
Represented By: Melissa Buckley Minix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAYD DURCHOLZ
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?