WILSON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE WILSON
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 3:2019cv00137
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of Documents, filed by Plaintiff STEPHANIE WILSON. (JRB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2) (JRB). Modified on 7/26/2019 (JRB). (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/26/2019) (JRB).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/16/2019. (JRB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (JRB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff STEPHANIE WILSON. (JRB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by STEPHANIE WILSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (JRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?