MICHAEL v. RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.
Plaintiff: JENNIFER MICHAEL
Defendant: RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00157
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
2 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss TO 10/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/30/2019. (JRB)
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER MICHAEL. (Biesecker, Kyle)
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER MICHAEL. (Biesecker, Kyle)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to October 4, 2019 re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER MICHAEL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Biesecker, Kyle)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Vacate March 2, 2020 Settlement Conference, filed by Defendant RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oxyer, Alexandra)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendant RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.. (Oxyer, Alexandra)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER MICHAEL. (Biesecker, Kyle)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2020. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/12/2019. (GD)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/12/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 12:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #131, United States Courthouse, 921 Ohio Street, Terre Haute, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - A motion for the entry of an agreed protective order should be filed as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 14 days prior to the original due date for any discovery response with regard to which the responding party proposes to rely upon the protective order when responding. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/11/2019.(JRB)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.. (Craig, Darren)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craig, Darren)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER MICHAEL . (Biesecker, Kyle)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/8/2019.(GD)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.. (Oxyer, Alexandra)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 3:19-cv-157-RLY-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (JRB)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/6/2019. (TMB)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in Vanderburgh Circuit Court)(Craig, Darren)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra S. Oxyer on behalf of Defendant RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.. (Oxyer, Alexandra)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.. (Craig, Darren)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Andrew Craig on behalf of Defendant RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.. (Craig, Darren)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vanderburgh Circuit Court, case number 82C01-1906-CT-003457, filed by RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5560055) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 25, 2019- Complaint for Damages and Reqeust for Jury Trial, #2 State Court Record State Court Docket Sheet, Appearance, Complaint for Damages and Request for Jury Trial, Summons, Service Returned Served, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Craig, Darren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MICHAEL v. RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RINEY HANCOCK, CPAS, P.S.C.
Represented By: Darren Andrew Craig
Represented By: Alexandra S. Oxyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER MICHAEL
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?