AWGI, LLC et al v. AMERICAN WIDE RELOCATION INC
Plaintiff: ATLAS VAN LINES, INC. and AWGI, LLC
Defendant: AMERICAN WIDE RELOCATION INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00173
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Judgment) (JRB)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for default judgment hearing held 10/01/19 before Judge Richard L. Young. Comes now the Plaintiffs, telephonically, by counsel. The defendant does not appear for default judgment hearing set this date. The court hears argument from the plaintiff and enters judgment for the Plaintiff, which shall issue by separate order. (Court Reporter Maggie Techert.) (TMD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 FINAL JUDGMENT - Consistent with the granting of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, the court now enters final judgment in favor of the Plaintiffs and against the Defendant. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/1/2019.(JRB)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Default Judgment - This matter having come before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Default Judgment. The court being duly advised in the premises, having reviewed Plaintiffs' Motion and incorporated Brief in Support thereof, hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Defendant via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/1/2019. (JRB)
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to , filed by Plaintiffs ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Warzecha, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to AMERICAN WIDE RELOCATION INC. Signed by Clerk, Laura A. Briggs. (JRB)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiffs ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Entry of Default)(Warzecha, Mark)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Warzecha, Mark)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - The court sets this matter for a preliminary injunction hearing on OCTOBER 1, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Counsel shall appear before the Honorable Richard L. Young, Judge, in room 301 of the Federal Building, 101 NW Martin Luther King, Jr., Blvd., Evansville, Indiana 47708. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/10/2019.(JRB)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. AMERICAN WIDE RELOCATION INC served on 8/22/2019. (Warzecha, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Submission Executed Verification of Donald J. Breivogel for Doc. 1, filed by Plaintiffs ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC. (Warzecha, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Submission Executed Verification of Tania Herke for Doc. 1, filed by Plaintiffs ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC. (Warzecha, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ATLAS WORLD GROUP, INC. for ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC.. (Warzecha, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ATLAS WORLD GROUP, INC. for ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC.. (Warzecha, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC. (LAB) (JRB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN WIDE RELOCATION INC. (JRB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A-Declaration of Mary Prater in Support, #3 Exhibit B-Declaration of Caleb Sutton in Support, #4 Exhibit C-Declaration of Lynn Taff in Support, #5 Exhibit D-Declaration of Kristin Cathey in Support, #6 Exhibit E-BBB Website for American Movers Storage, #7 Exhibit F-Declaration of Mary Beth Johnson in Support, #8 Exhibit G-SAFER Web Company Snapshot AMERICAN WIDE RELOCATION INC, #9 Exhibit H-Cease & Desist letter to Atlas Moving and Storage, #10 Exhibit I-Declaration of Mark Warzecha in Support, #11 Exhibit J-Whois Search Results for atlasmovingandstorage.co)(Warzecha, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warzecha, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark F. Warzecha on behalf of Plaintiffs ATLAS VAN LINES, INC., AWGI, LLC. (Warzecha, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5584334) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-SAFER Web Company Snapshot AMERICAN WIDE RELOCATION INC, #3 Exhibit B-Cease & Desist letter to Atlas Moving and Storage, #4 Exhibit C-American Wide Relocation Inc 2019 Annual Report, #5 Exhibit D-First Priority Van Lines Website, #6 Exhibit E-American Movers & Storage Website, #7 Exhibit F-State-to-State Moving & Storage Website, #8 Exhibit G-Declaration of Mary Prater in Support, #9 Exhibit H-Declaration of Caleb Sutton in Support, #10 Exhibit I-Declaration of Lynn Taff in Support, #11 Exhibit J-Declaration of Kristin Cathey in Support, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons)(Warzecha, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AWGI, LLC et al v. AMERICAN WIDE RELOCATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLAS VAN LINES, INC.
Represented By: Mark F. Warzecha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AWGI, LLC
Represented By: Mark F. Warzecha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN WIDE RELOCATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?