COURTNEY et al v. MURPHY et al
Plaintiff: BROCK COURTNEY and SALENA COURTNEY
Defendant: MATTHEW MURPHY, SAMANTHA FREEMAN and NAQUASHA STEWART
Case Number: 3:2019cv00174
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #13 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Defendants SAMANTHA FREEMAN, MATTHEW MURPHY, NAQUASHA STEWART. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Permitting Filing Under Seal)(Cochran, Kelly)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED Exhibits, re #12 Brief/Memorandum in Support, filed by Defendants SAMANTHA FREEMAN, MATTHEW MURPHY, NAQUASHA STEWART. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dispositional Order, #2 Exhibit B - Court Order)(Cochran, Kelly)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants SAMANTHA FREEMAN, MATTHEW MURPHY, NAQUASHA STEWART. (Cochran, Kelly)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants SAMANTHA FREEMAN, MATTHEW MURPHY, NAQUASHA STEWART. (Cochran, Kelly)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 11:30 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/8/2019.(JRB)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Robert Lowry on behalf of Defendants SAMANTHA FREEMAN, MATTHEW MURPHY, NAQUASHA STEWART. (Lowry, Joshua)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants SAMANTHA FREEMAN, MATTHEW MURPHY, NAQUASHA STEWART. (Cochran, Kelly)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Cochran on behalf of Defendants SAMANTHA FREEMAN, MATTHEW MURPHY, NAQUASHA STEWART. (Cochran, Kelly)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendants Matthew Murphy, Naquasha Stewart, and Samantha Freeman on 8/21/19, filed by BROCK COURTNEY, SALENA COURTNEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Mail Receipts)(Catlin, Brad)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SAMANTHA FREEMAN, MATTHEW MURPHY and NAQUASHA STEWART. (JRB)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald J. Waicukauski on behalf of Plaintiffs BROCK COURTNEY, SALENA COURTNEY. (Waicukauski, Ronald)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad A. Catlin on behalf of Plaintiffs BROCK COURTNEY, SALENA COURTNEY. (Catlin, Brad)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5584740) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Catlin, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COURTNEY et al v. MURPHY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW MURPHY
Represented By: Kelly Cochran
Represented By: Joshua Robert Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMANTHA FREEMAN
Represented By: Kelly Cochran
Represented By: Joshua Robert Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAQUASHA STEWART
Represented By: Kelly Cochran
Represented By: Joshua Robert Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROCK COURTNEY
Represented By: Brad A. Catlin
Represented By: Ronald J. Waicukauski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALENA COURTNEY
Represented By: Brad A. Catlin
Represented By: Ronald J. Waicukauski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?