NEAL v. SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION
Plaintiff: GWENDOLYN NEAL
Defendant: SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv00192
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Bernard J. Bobber hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Bobber, Bernard)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/8/2019.(JRB)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent Silgan Holdings Inc. for SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service for Defendant's Corporation Disclosure Statement)(Townsend, Christine)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service for Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Townsend, Christine)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Christina L. Wabiszewski for SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/7/2019. (JRB)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christina L. Wabiszewski to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5663462), filed by Defendant SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Christina L. Wabiszewski In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Service for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bobber, Bernard)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw Documents #5 and #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/3/2019. (JRB)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Christine Bestor Townsend for SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/3/2019. (JRB)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION. (LAB) (JRB)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION for Attorney(s) Christine Bestor Townsend to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5655718), filed by Defendant SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Christine Bestor Townsend In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Service for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bobber, Bernard) Modified on 10/3/2019 (JRB).
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard J. Bobber on behalf of Defendant SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bobber, Bernard)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw Documents, filed by Defendant SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service for Motion to Withdraw Documents)(Bobber, Bernard)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY #12 *** MOTION for Attorney(s) Christine Bestor Townsend to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5655718), filed by Defendant SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Christine Bestor Townsend In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Service for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bobber, Bernard) Modified on 10/3/2019 (JRB).
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY #12 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard J. Bobber on behalf of Defendant SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bobber, Bernard) Modified on 10/3/2019 (JRB).
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMB)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION. (TMB)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Frederick Biesecker on behalf of Plaintiff GWENDOLYN NEAL. (Biesecker, Kyle)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION, filed by GWENDOLYN NEAL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5626476) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biesecker, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEAL v. SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILGAN WHITE CAP CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWENDOLYN NEAL
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?