GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY v. SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: E. H., H. H., LISA GEORGE, SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY, RICHARD FORTWENDEL and NEW BOSTON TAVERN, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00052
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 22 Society's ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY, filed by SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nettles, Nelson)
April 27, 2020 Filing 21 Defendants' ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, filed by LISA GEORGE, E. H., H. H..(Ring, Kyle)
March 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle T. Ring on behalf of Defendants LISA GEORGE, E. H., H. H.. (Ring, Kyle)
March 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Buba on behalf of Defendants LISA GEORGE, E. H., H. H.. (Buba, Daniel)
March 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants LISA GEORGE, E. H., H. H.. (Doehrman, Thomas)
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Doehrman on behalf of Defendants LISA GEORGE, E. H., H. H.. (Doehrman, Thomas)
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Nettles, Nelson)
March 17, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY for SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Nettles, Nelson)
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Hendren on behalf of Defendant SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Hendren, Amanda)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Kirk LeBlanc on behalf of Defendant SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY. (LeBlanc, Joel)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson A. Nettles on behalf of Defendant SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Nettles, Nelson)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to RICHARD FORTWENDEL and NEW BOSTON TAVERN, INC. (JRB)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY. (Goodman, Ian)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Grinnell Mutual Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint in Underlying Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Grinnell Mutual January 4, 2019 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 4 - Society Insurance January 31, 2019 Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5 - Counsel for Grinnell Mutual April 15, 2019 Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 6 - Counsel for Society Insurance May 17, 2019 Correspondence, #7 Proposed Summons)(Goodman, Ian)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 Submission of Signature Requirement re #1 Complaint by GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY. (Goodman, Ian)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY. (LAB) (AAS)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to LISA GEORGE, E. H., H. H., SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY. (JRB)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Strenski on behalf of Plaintiff GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY. (Strenski, James)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian P. Goodman on behalf of Plaintiff GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY. (Goodman, Ian)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LISA GEORGE, E. H., H. H., SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5889264) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Grinnell Mutual Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint in Underlying Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Grinnell Mutual January 4, 2019 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 4 - Society Insurance January 31, 2019 Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5 - Counsel for Grinnell Mutual April 15, 2019 Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 6 - Counsel for Society Insurance May 17, 2019 Correspondence, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Goodman, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY v. SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. H.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buba
Represented By: Kyle T. Ring
Represented By: Thomas C. Doehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. H.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buba
Represented By: Kyle T. Ring
Represented By: Thomas C. Doehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA GEORGE
Represented By: Daniel J. Buba
Represented By: Kyle T. Ring
Represented By: Thomas C. Doehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Nelson A. Nettles
Represented By: Joel Kirk LeBlanc
Represented By: Amanda M. Hendren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD FORTWENDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW BOSTON TAVERN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRINNELL MUTUAL REINSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Ian P. Goodman
Represented By: James P. Strenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?