P.L. et al v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: PL, Terri L Monical, BD, Brian L Monical, P. L. and B. D.
Defendant: TERRY J. STIGDON, Texas Department of Family and Protective Services, John Anthony Dossey, Carissa Rogers, Mary Beth Bonaventura, Misty M Bullerdick, Hank Whitman, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES, Jaime Masters, MISTY M. BULLERDICK and CARISSA N. ROGERS
Case Number: 3:2020cv00169
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Dickmeyer on behalf of Defendants MARY BETH BONAVENTURA, MISTY M. BULLERDICK, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES, CARISSA N. ROGERS, TERRY J. STIGDON. (Dickmeyer, David)
September 14, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Texas Department of Family Service and Hank Whitman on 7/28/20, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rock, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Substitution of Appearance by Cameron S. Huffman replacing Benjamin Ellis on behalf of MARY BETH BONAVENTURA, MISTY M. BULLERDICK, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES, CARISSA N. ROGERS, TERRY J. STIGDON (Huffman, Cameron)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Discovery, filed by Defendants JAIME MASTERS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES, HANK WHITMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Discovery)(Patterson, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rock, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss - Plaintiffs shall have a 30-day extension of time, to and including October 2, 2020, to respond to the Defendants, Texas Department of Family and Protective Services, Hank Whitman, and Jamie Masters, Motion to Dismiss Doc. #15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/27/2020. (AAS)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re #15 Motion to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiffs B. D., P. L.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rock, Robert) Modified text and added link on 8/27/2020 (TMB).
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Michael J. Patterson hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Patterson, Michael)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES, WHITMAN, INC., JAIME MASTERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Whitman Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Master Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Indiana Orders, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting 12(b)(2) motion, #5 Text of Proposed Order Granting 12(b)(1) & (6) motion)(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 8/14/2020 (AAS). Modified on 8/14/2020 (AAS).
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by MARY BETH BONAVENTURA, MISTY M. BULLERDICK, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES, CARISSA N. ROGERS, TERRY J. STIGDON.(Ellis, Benjamin)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Ellis on behalf of Defendants MARY BETH BONAVENTURA, MISTY M. BULLERDICK, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES, CARISSA N. ROGERS, TERRY J. STIGDON. (Ellis, Benjamin)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael J. Patterson for JAIME MASTERS,Michael J. Patterson for TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES,Michael J. Patterson for HANK WHITMAN added. Copy sent to Counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/6/2020. (JRB)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Patterson to Appear pro hac vice $100 Fee paid IP070248, filed by Defendants JAIME MASTERS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES, HANK WHITMAN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(JRB) Modified on 8/5/2020 (JRB).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 MOTION FOR REFUND OF A FILING FEE - The Clerk shall reimburse Plaintiffs the $400.00 filing fee paid to initiate cause number 3:20-cv-168-RLY-MPB which is no longer an active case. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/4/2020. (AAS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Submission of Proposed Order on Motion for Refund of a Filing Fee, re #7 MOTION Requesting Refund of a Filing Fee, filed by Plaintiffs B. D., P. L.. (Rock, Robert)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Mary Beth Bonaventure on 7/17/20, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rock, Robert)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION Requesting Refund of a Filing Fee, filed by Plaintiffs B. D., P. L.. (Rock, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JAIME MASTERS. (AAS)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to B. D., P. L.. (Rock, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Rock on behalf of Plaintiffs B. D., P. L.. (Rock, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MARY BETH BONAVENTURA, MISTY M. BULLERDICK, JOHN ANTHONY DOSSEY, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES, JAIME MASTERS, CARISSA N. ROGERS, TERRY J. STIGDON, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES, HANK WHITMAN. (JRB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6082188) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons)(Rock, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P.L. et al v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY J. STIGDON
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Represented By: Benjamin C. Ellis
Represented By: David C. Dickmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Family and Protective Services
Represented By: Michael J. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Anthony Dossey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carissa Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Bonaventura
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Represented By: Benjamin C. Ellis
Represented By: David C. Dickmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty M Bullerdick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank Whitman
Represented By: Michael J. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Represented By: Benjamin C. Ellis
Represented By: David C. Dickmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Masters
Represented By: Michael J. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISTY M. BULLERDICK
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Represented By: Benjamin C. Ellis
Represented By: David C. Dickmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARISSA N. ROGERS
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Represented By: Benjamin C. Ellis
Represented By: David C. Dickmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PL
Represented By: Robert W. Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri L Monical
Represented By: Robert W. Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BD
Represented By: Robert W. Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian L Monical
Represented By: Robert W. Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. L.
Represented By: Robert W. Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. D.
Represented By: Robert W. Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?