JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. KIM et al
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Defendant: GENESIS BUSINESS SYSTEMS, LLC doing business as Gangnam Korean BBQ, SARAH YING AL KIM and JOSEPH J. KIM
Case Number: 3:2020cv00188
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Joseph J. Kim, Sarah Ying Ai Kim, and Genesis Business Systems, LLC on 10/06/2020, filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Janis, Ryan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GENESIS BUSINESS SYSTEMS, LLC, JOSEPH J. KIM, SARAH YING AL KIM. (JRB)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that Ryan R. Janis, Esq. register as a user of the courts electronic case filing system by September 1, 2020. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. PLEASE NOTE CHANGES TO PROPOSED ORDER. Copy to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/18/2020. (AAS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ryan R. Janis to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP070349) filed by Plaintiff JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(AKH) Modified on 8/17/2020 (AKH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #2 Envelope) (AKH).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GENESIS BUSINESS SYSTEMS, LLC, JOSEPH J. KIM, SARAH YING AL KIM, filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP070349) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. KIM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENESIS BUSINESS SYSTEMS, LLC doing business as Gangnam Korean BBQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH YING AL KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH J. KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Janis
Represented By: Ryan R. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?