MINOR v. BLACKARD
Plaintiff: LEONTE RAYSHAUN MINOR
Defendant: BARRY M. BLACKARD
Case Number: 3:2020cv00196
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #3 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction sent to LEONTE RAYSHAUN MINOR, 1415 E. Adams St., Evansville, IN 47713. (AAS)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT AND ORDER TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Complaint fails to allege any claimthat section of the Complaint isblank. Accordingly, Minor's Complaint (Filing No. 1) is DISMISSED withoutprejudice. If Minor chooses to refile his Complaint, he must do so by September 30,2020. The Complaint should contain a short, plain statement of the claim. Legalarguments are not necessary at this point. The Complaint should briefly describe the facts giving rise to the claim, including dates and locations of any incidents, how the Defendant was involved, and what actions or omissions by the Defendant caused the harm. If there are multiple claims against the Defendant, list each claim separately and include the relevant facts for each claim. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/1/2020.(JRB)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/1/2020. (AAS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LEONTE RAYSHAUN MINOR. (REO)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BARRY M. BLACKARD, filed by LEONTE RAYSHAUN MINOR. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MINOR v. BLACKARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY M. BLACKARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONTE RAYSHAUN MINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?