WILLIAMS v. MEADE
Plaintiff: JEREMY J. WILLIAMS
Defendant: JEFFREY MEADE
Case Number: 3:2020cv00220
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE from Gibson County Jail re #10 Entry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Court Assistance - SEE ORDER. Copy sent Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/3/2020. (JRB)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - Williams is directed to request his account statement again from the Gibson County Jail and file it with the court. Williams shall file this document by November 23, 2020. Otherwise his case will be dismissed without prejudice. The clerk is directed to send a copy of this Entry to the Gibson County Jail. Copy to Plaintiff and Gibson County Jail via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/26/2020.(AAS)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Court to grant Motion for In Forma Pauperis #6 , filed by Plaintiff JEREMY J. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 Submission of Account Transaction History, filed by Plaintiff JEREMY J. WILLIAMS. (JRB)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - Williams is directed to file a certified copy of his trust fund account by November 11, 2020. Otherwise, his case will be DISMISSED without prejudice. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/13/2020.(AAS)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JEREMY J. WILLIAMS. (JRB)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through 10/20/2020 in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (JRB)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Court's Assistance, filed by Plaintiff JEREMY J. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(AAS)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JEREMY J. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS) Modified on 9/29/2020 (AAS).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFREY MEADE, filed by JEREMY J. WILLIAMS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. MEADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY J. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY MEADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?