MAHER v. COLOPLAST CORP.
Plaintiff: KELLY MAHER
Defendant: COLOPLAST CORP.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00186
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Filing 22 Statement [DEFENDANT COLOPLAST CORP.'S LOCAL RULE 16-2 STATEMENT] by COLOPLAST CORP.. (Kazmierczak, Kristopher)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on February 6, 2023 at 9:00 a.m., Evansville Time (CST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/06/2022.(AAS)
November 22, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Smith on behalf of Defendant COLOPLAST CORP.. (Smith, Brooke)
November 22, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher N. Kazmierczak on behalf of Defendant COLOPLAST CORP.. (Kazmierczak, Kristopher)
November 22, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally F. Zweig on behalf of Defendant COLOPLAST CORP.. (Zweig, Sally)
November 21, 2022 Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
November 21, 2022 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 4:22-cv-00071. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana, Evansville Division. (case electronically transferred to INSD) Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/18/22. (mlc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Caio Formenti PHV for Kelly Maher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/17/2022. (ace) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 13 SCHEDULED AS TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on 11/17/2022, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pla appeared by atty Caio Formenti. Dft appeared by atty Kristopher Kazmierczak. Pltf orally moves to transfer this matter to the Southern District of Indiana, no objection from Dft. Written order to follow. (Tape #ATT HOST 5.) (tc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 12 Application for Attorney Caio Formenti to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kelly Maher. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5081400 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)(Formenti, Caio) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
November 9, 2022 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kazmierczak, Kristopher) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2022 11:15 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/28/2022. (tc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Smith on behalf of Coloplast Corp. (Smith, Brooke) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher N Kazmierczak on behalf of Coloplast Corp. (Kazmierczak, Kristopher) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coloplast Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Coloplast A/S for Coloplast Corp... (Zweig, Sally) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 DEFENDANT COLOPLAST CORP.S ANSWER to #1 Complaint FOR DAMAGES AND JURY DEMAND by Coloplast Corp..(Zweig, Sally) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally Franklin Zweig on behalf of Coloplast Corp. (Zweig, Sally) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
September 28, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coloplast Corp. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
September 28, 2022 **NEW CASE** Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (jdb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph N Williams on behalf of Kelly Maher (Williams, Joseph) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Coloplast Corp( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5033413.), filed by Kelly Maher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Williams, Joseph) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/21/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAHER v. COLOPLAST CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY MAHER
Represented By: Caio Formenti PHV
Represented By: Joseph N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLOPLAST CORP.
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Kristopher N. Kazmierczak
Represented By: Sally Franklin Zweig
Represented By: Sally F. Zweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?