BROWN v. HENDRICKS COUNTY HOSPITAL D/B/A BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE WOODBRIDGE CARE CENTER ET AL
Plaintiff: CAROL BROWN
Defendant: HENDRICKS COUNTY HOSPITAL D/B/A BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE WOODBRIDGE CARE CENTER, BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE, INC. and GGNSC EVANSVILLE WOODBRIDGE LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00108
Filed: June 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Crystal S Wildeman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Filing 16 Case transferred in from Indianapolis Division Division on 06/20/2024 Case Number 1:24-cv-702-JRS-MJD. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Crystal S. Wildeman and District Judge Matthew P. Brookman, filed by CAROL BROWN.(AAS)
June 17, 2024 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Johnson, Rachel)
May 20, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE, INC., GGNSC EVANSVILLE WOODBRIDGE LLC, HENDRICKS COUNTY HOSPITAL D/B/A BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE WOODBRIDGE CARE CENTER. (Cunningham, Norris)
May 20, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Norris Cunningham on behalf of Defendants BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE, INC., GGNSC EVANSVILLE WOODBRIDGE LLC, HENDRICKS COUNTY HOSPITAL D/B/A BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE WOODBRIDGE CARE CENTER. (Cunningham, Norris)
May 20, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel D. Johnson on behalf of Defendants BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE, INC., GGNSC EVANSVILLE WOODBRIDGE LLC, HENDRICKS COUNTY HOSPITAL D/B/A BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE WOODBRIDGE CARE CENTER. (Johnson, Rachel)
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 RETURN of Service, filed by CAROL BROWN. GGNSC EVANSVILLE WOODBRIDGE LLC served on 4/30/2024. (Daniell, Robert)
May 6, 2024 Filing 10 RETURN of Service, filed by CAROL BROWN. BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE, INC. served on 4/30/2024. (Daniell, Robert)
May 6, 2024 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by CAROL BROWN. HENDRICKS COUNTY HOSPITAL D/B/A BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE WOODBRIDGE CARE CENTER served on 4/29/2024. (Daniell, Robert)
April 24, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Daniell on behalf of Plaintiff CAROL BROWN. (Daniell, Robert)
April 24, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Needham on behalf of Plaintiff CAROL BROWN. (Needham, Bradley)
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Runyon on behalf of Plaintiff CAROL BROWN. (Runyon, Jacob)
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (BAA)
April 24, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (BAA)
April 24, 2024 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (BAA)
April 24, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued to BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE, INC., GGNSC EVANSVILLE WOODBRIDGE LLC, and HENDRICKS COUNTY HOSPITAL D/B/A BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE WOODBRIDGE CARE CENTER. (BAA)
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE, INC., GGNSC EVANSVILLE WOODBRIDGE LLC, HENDRICKS COUNTY HOSPITAL, filed by Carol Brown. (Filing fee $405, receipt number BINSDC-8129393) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Daniell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. HENDRICKS COUNTY HOSPITAL D/B/A BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE WOODBRIDGE CARE CENTER ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL BROWN
Represented By: Bradley Needham
Represented By: Jacob Runyon
Represented By: Robert Daniell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENDRICKS COUNTY HOSPITAL D/B/A BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE WOODBRIDGE CARE CENTER
Represented By: Norris Cunningham
Represented By: Rachel D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRICKYARD HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Norris Cunningham
Represented By: Rachel D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC EVANSVILLE WOODBRIDGE LLC
Represented By: Norris Cunningham
Represented By: Rachel D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?