COMER v. SCHNEDIER et al
Plaintiff: |
JOSHUA E. COMER |
Defendant: |
NICHOLAS BEETZ, KENDLE DAVIS, DAVID SCHNEDIER and GARY W. SORGE |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv00095 |
Filed: |
August 18, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
New Albany Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Debra McVicker Lynch |
Presiding Judge: |
Tanya Walton Pratt |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 8, 2016 |
Filing
22
ENTRY Discussing Post Judgment Motion - The plaintiff's motion does not demonstrate a manifest error of law or present newly discovered evidence. Nor does the motion provide an explanation for his delay in responding to the defendant's moti on for summary judgment. In addition, there is no indication what arguments or evidence the plaintiff would like to present which could change the outcome of this case. Under these circumstances, the plaintiff's post judgment motion Dkt. 21 is DENIED. See Entry for details. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/8/2016. (MAG)
|
January 11, 2016 |
Filing
19
ENTRY Discussing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment - 14 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The undisputed record reflects that Detective Schneider did not violate Mr. Comer's Fourth Amendment rights. See Entry for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/11/2016 (copy mailed to plaintiff). (LBT)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
4
ENTRY Discussing Complaint, Dismissing Certain Claims, and Directing Further Proceedings - 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Attorney Gary W. Sorge is DISMISSED. Claims against Det. Nicholas Beetz and Sgt. Kendle Davis are DISMISSED. Any claim for relief based on the theory that a defendant committed perjury is DISMISSED. This action shall proceed as to the Fourth Amendment claims alleged against Det. David Schnedier. Specifically, Comer's claim that Det. Sc hnedier subjected him to false arrest and confinement and conducted an illegal search and seizure shall proceed as submitted. The clerk is designated, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), to issue and serve process on the defendants in the manner specified by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(1). Process shall consist of the complaint, applicable forms and this Entry. See Entry for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/25/2014 (copy mailed to plaintiff). (LBT)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?