SOUTHERN INDIANA COMMUNITY HOUSING CORPORATION v. PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN INDIANA COMMUNITY HOUSING CORPORATION
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BRANCH BANKING & TRUST COMPANY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE and STATE OF INDIANA
Case Number: 4:2018cv00165
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on October 12, 2018, with the magistrate judge. This case is set for a telephone status conference on January 15, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #9 ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Plaintiff has moved for an entry of default against the Defendants, PNC Bank (PNC), National Association, Branch Banking & Trust Company, and the State of Indiana, Department of pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and has submitted an affidavit in support thereof. Plaintiff has attached to its affidavits, the returns of service; however this case was removed and the actual returns are not on the docket. In addition, the certificate of service does not indicate this motion was mailed to the Defendants PNC and BB&T. Morevoer, the Order on Motion for Extension of Time that was served on PNC was returned as undeliverable (See dkt. #10 ). The Court is not certain the correct parties were served. Accordingly, Plaintiff is instructed to docket the actual returns in this action; and provide a certificate of service on its Motion for Clerk's Default. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/12/2018. (MAT)
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Shields, Gina)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File sent to William S. Demchak, President, 222 Delaware Avenue, Wilmington, DE 19801. Envelope marked return to sender, unable to forward. (LBT)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiff SOUTHERN INDIANA COMMUNITY HOUSING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default)(Burnette, William)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 11:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/14/2018.(LBT)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHERN INDIANA COMMUNITY HOUSING CORPORATION. (Burnette, William)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William Brian Burnette on behalf of Plaintiff SOUTHERN INDIANA COMMUNITY HOUSING CORPORATION. (Burnette, William)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/12/2018 for the Defendant, the United States of America, Internal Revenue Service to respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/12/2018 (copies mailed per distribution list). (LBT)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 12, 2018 , filed by Defendant THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina M. Shields on behalf of Defendant THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Shields, Gina)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Floyd Circuit County Court, case number 22C01-1808-PL-001069, filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Exhibit A- Summons, Complaint & Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shields, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUTHERN INDIANA COMMUNITY HOUSING CORPORATION v. PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANCH BANKING & TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Gina M. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN INDIANA COMMUNITY HOUSING CORPORATION
Represented By: William Brian Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?