HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION v. FIRST STAR LOGISTICS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION
Defendant: FIRST STAR LOGISTICS, LLC and QFS TRANSPORTATION LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00231
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:14706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 9:30 AM, (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/17/2019. (MAT)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QFS TRANSPORTATION LLC. (Strawbridge, Bryan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIRST STAR LOGISTICS, LLC. (Strawbridge, Bryan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants FIRST STAR LOGISTICS, LLC, QFS TRANSPORTATION LLC. (Strawbridge, Bryan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenai M. Brackett on behalf of Defendants FIRST STAR LOGISTICS, LLC, QFS TRANSPORTATION LLC. (Brackett, Jenai)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan S. Strawbridge on behalf of Defendants FIRST STAR LOGISTICS, LLC, QFS TRANSPORTATION LLC. (Strawbridge, Bryan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick D. Emhardt on behalf of Plaintiff HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION. (Emhardt, Frederick)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Kochert Townsend on behalf of Plaintiff HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION. (Townsend, Andrea)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to First Star Logistics, LLC and QFS Transportation LLC on 12/12/2018, filed by Plaintiff HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION. (Gotwald, Gregory)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION identifying ROYCE & ASSOCIATES LP and LEGG MASON as Corporate Parents of HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION. (Gotwald, Gregory) Modified on 12/13/2018 to identify corporate parents (LBT).
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Gotwald on behalf of Plaintiff HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION. (Gotwald, Gregory)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIRST STAR LOGISTICS, LLC, QFS TRANSPORTATION LLC, filed by HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5194815) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 9.2.16 Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Credit Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - Purported Rules Circular, #4 Exhibit 4 - 10.5.16 Email, #5 Exhibit 5 - Original Invoices, #6 Exhibit 6 - 10.6.16 Email with Altered Invoices, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice and Purported Warehouse Receipt, #8 Exhibit 8 - 10.12.16 Email, #9 Exhibit 9 - 12.8.16 Letter from First Star Counsel, #10 Exhibit 10 - 12.9.16 Purported Notice of Enforcement, #11 Exhibit 11 - Carmack Notice, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gotwald, Gregory) Modified on 12/13/2018 (LBT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION v. FIRST STAR LOGISTICS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST STAR LOGISTICS, LLC
Represented By: Jenai M. Brackett
Represented By: Bryan S. Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QFS TRANSPORTATION LLC
Represented By: Jenai M. Brackett
Represented By: Bryan S. Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOOKER FURNITURE CORPORATION
Represented By: Gregory M. Gotwald
Represented By: Andrea Kochert Townsend
Represented By: Frederick D. Emhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?