SPENCER v. GLOBAL PAYMENTS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: PATTY A SPENCER and PATTY A. SPENCER
Defendant: GLOBAL PAYMENTS, INC., HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS, LLC and GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2018cv00236
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against PATTY A. SPENCER, filed by PATTY A. SPENCER.(Falkner, Rheanne)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 9:30 AM (Eastern Time), before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/22/2019. (MAT)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Mosby, Brian)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GLOBAL PAYMENTS, INC., HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS, LLC. (MAT)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rheanne D. Falkner on behalf of Plaintiff PATTY A SPENCER. (Falkner, Rheanne)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by PATTY A SPENCER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5206859) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Global Payments, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Heartland Payment Systems, LLC)(Falkner, Rheanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPENCER v. GLOBAL PAYMENTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATTY A SPENCER
Represented By: Rheanne D. Falkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATTY A. SPENCER
Represented By: Rheanne D. Falkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL PAYMENTS, INC.
Represented By: Brian Lee Mosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: Brian Lee Mosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?