KEITH v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: Shannon Keith
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2019cv00042
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 18 SCHEDULING ENTRY: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. PLEASE NOTE THE INDIANAPOLIS LOCATION OF THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 at 9:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #200, United States Courthouse, 121 W. Spring Street, New Albany, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker.(LBT)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/22/2019. (MAT)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by counsel on 4/5/2019 for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 4/6/2020. Non-expert witness and liability discovery due by 1/6/2020. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/5/2019.(LBT)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on April 5, 2019, with magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on July 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Drummy, John)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY . (Drummy, John)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 Submission of Additional State Court Records by Clerk, Lawrence County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Appearance of John Drummy for Defendant, Notice to Plaintiff and Clerk of the Lawrence Circuit Court of Defendant's Removal of Action to Federal Court, Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Rodney L. Scott, Order of Withdrawl of Counsel, #2 Envelope)(LBT)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Removal Notice in the Lawrence County Circuit Court by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff and clerk of Lawrence County of Defendant's Removal of Action to Federal Court) (Drummy, John)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Notice of Removal , filed by Plaintiff SHANNON KEITH. (Dumas, Matthew) Modified on 3/15/2019 to edit docket text (MAT).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time), in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/12/2019. (MAT)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Drummy, John)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Edward Dumas on behalf of Plaintiff SHANNON KEITH. (Dumas, Matthew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Blake Wong on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Wong, Kyle)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pending State Court Motions, filed by Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Drummy, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Drummy, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Drummy on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Drummy, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lawrence Circuit Court, case number 47C01-1901-CT-000128, filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5320438) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix A - State Court Record (Complaint, Summons, Appearances, Motion for Time, Order on Motion for Time), #3 Appendix B - Complaint)(Drummy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEITH v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John B. Drummy
Represented By: Kyle Blake Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Keith
Represented By: Matthew Edward Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?