PEARSON v. SAUL

Plaintiff: KENNETH M. PEARSON, JR.
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 4:2019cv00059
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to 8/6/2019 to file the brief. No additional enlargements of time will be anticipated. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/25/2019. (CBU)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 6, 2019 to file Plaintiff's brief, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH M. PEARSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vrana, Timothy)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Within twenty-eight (28) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of the complaint. Within twenty-eight (28) days after service of Plaintiff's brief, Defendant shall file a brief in response. Within fourteen (14) days after service of Defendant's opposition brief, Plaintiff will file his/her reply brief, if any. See Order for additional information. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/4/2019.(LBT)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative documents 4.13.13, #3 payment documents 4.13.13, #4 jurisdictional documents 4.13.13, #5 non disability related documents 4.13.13, #6 disability related documents 4.13.13, #7 medical records part 1 4.13.13, #8 medical records part 2 4.13.13, #9 medical records part 3 4.13.13, #10 medical records part 4 4.13.13, #11 administrative records part 1 5.17.19, #12 administrative records part 2 5.7.19, #13 payment documents 5.7.19, #14 jurisdictional documents part 1 5.7.19, #15 jurisdictional documents part 2 5.7.19, #16 non disability related documents 5.7.19, #17 disability related documents 5.7.19, #18 medical records part 1 5.7.19, #19 medical records part 2 5.7.19)(Wierenga, Julian)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, [Filing No. #3 ], is GRANTED. While in forma pauperis status allows the plaintiff to proceed without pre-payment of the filing fee, the plaintiff remains liable for the full fees. The filing fee for in forma pauperis litigants is $350. Immediate payment is not required. However, the $350 balance remains owing. See Entry for details. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/5/2019. Copy sent to US Attorney via US mail. (MAT)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff KENNETH M. PEARSON, JR. (Vrana, Timothy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Vrana on behalf of Plaintiff KENNETH M. PEARSON, JR. (Vrana, Timothy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Review Decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by KENNETH M. PEARSON, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vrana, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEARSON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH M. PEARSON, JR.
Represented By: Timothy J. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?