JOOST v. AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC
Plaintiff: JEREMY JOOST
Defendant: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00064
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: New Albany Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order Regarding Discovery Disputes - Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(1) and S.D. Ind. L.R. 37-1(a), counsel must confer in good faith to resolve a discovery dispute before involving the court in the dispute. If counsel have exhausted those efforts without resolving the dispute they must seek a discovery conference with the magistrate judge before the filing of a formal motion to compel or contested motion for protective order in the manner set forth. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/7/2019. (DMW)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by counsel on 6/4/2019 for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 10/10/2020. Non-expert witness and liability discovery due by 2/10/2020. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/5/2019.(LBT)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on June 4, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan, including a deadline of March 1, 2020 for section IV.B. This case is set for a telephone status conference on September 5, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Stanley J. Jacobs added for Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Stanley J. Jacobs register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by June 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/28/2019 (copy mailed to Atty Jacobs). (LBT) Modified on 5/28/2019 (LBT).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Ian F. Taylor is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case on behalf of plaintiff this matter. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Ian F. Taylor register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by June 6, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/23/2019. Copy sent to Ian Taylor via US Mail. (MAT)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jodi Jacobs Aamodt for Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Jodi Jacobs Aamodt register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by June 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/23/2019 (copies mailed per distribution list). (LBT) Modified on 5/23/2019 (LBT).
May 23, 2019 Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST . (Sterbcow, Paul)
May 23, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stanley J. Jacobs to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Stanley J. Jacobs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sterbcow, Paul)
May 22, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jodi J. Aamodt to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jodi J. Aamodt, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sterbcow, Paul)
May 22, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ian F. Taylor to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ian F. Taylor, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sterbcow, Paul)
May 22, 2019 Filing 38 Statement of Position by JEREMY JOOST. (Sterbcow, Paul)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Paul M. Sterbcow added as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/21/2019 (copy mailed to Attys Aamodt, Jacobs, and Taylor). (LBT)
May 15, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul M. Sterbcow to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sterbcow, Paul)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #31 Motion to Appear pro hac vice - This case is before the court on the motion for Stanley J. Jacobs to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff (Dkt. #31 ). Being duly advised, the court now DENIES the motion, without prejudice to refile the motion. Counsel is advised to strictly comply with all requirements of the Local Rules, specifically the rules regarding signature requirements for motions that are not filed electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/14/2019. Copy sent per distribution list via US Mail. (MAT)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #30 Motion to Appear pro hac vice - This case is before the court on the motion for Jodi Jacobs Aamodt to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff (Dkt. #30 ). Being duly advised, the court now DENIES the motion, without prejudice to refile the motion. Counsel is advised to strictly comply with all requirements of the Local Rules, specifically the rules regarding signature requirements for motions that are not filed electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/14/2019. Copy sent per distribution list via US Mail. (MAT)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #29 Motion to Appear pro hac vice - This case is before the court on the motion for Ian F. Taylor to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff (Dkt. #29 ). Being duly advised, the court now DENIES the motion, without prejudice to refile the motion. Counsel is advised to strictly comply with all requirements of the Local Rules, specifically the rules regarding signature requirements for motions that are not filed electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/14/2019. Copy sent per distribution list via US Mail. (MAT)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #28 Motion to Appear pro hac vice - This case is before the court on the motion for Paul M. Sterbcow to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff (Dkt. #28 ). Being duly advised, the court now DENIES the motion, without prejudice to refile the motion. Counsel is advised to strictly comply with all requirements of the Local Rules, specifically the rule regarding the form of filing a pro hac vice motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/14/2019. Copy sent per distribution list via US Mail. (MAT)
May 10, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stanley J. Jacobs to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number NA004080), filed by Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(MAT)
May 10, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jodi Jacobs Aamodt to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number NA004079), filed by Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(MAT)
May 10, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ian F. Taylor to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number NA004078), filed by Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(MAT)
May 10, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul M. Sterbcow to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number NA004077), filed by Plaintiff JEREMY JOOST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(MAT)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/3/2019.(LBT)
May 1, 2019 Filing 26 Statement of Position by AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC. (Guichard, Lauren)
May 1, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, filed by AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC.(Guichard, Lauren) Modified on 5/2/2019 to delete link to Complaint (MAT).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Kathleen P. Rice is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case on behalf of defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/24/2019 (copy mailed to Attorneys Aamodt, Jacobs and Taylor). (LBT)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Patrick J. McShane is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case on behalf of defendant.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/24/2019 (copy mailed to Attorneys Aamodt, Jacobs and Taylor). (LBT)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Lauren A. Guichard is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case on behalf of defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/24/2019 (copy mailed to Attorneys Aamody, Jacobs, and Taylor). (LBT)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Danica Denbow Denny is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case on behalf of defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/24/2019 (copy mailed to Attorneys Aamodt, Jacobs and Taylor). (LBT)
April 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kathleen P. Rice to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5396475), filed by Defendant AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Kathleen)
April 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patrick J. McShane to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5396473), filed by Defendant AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McShane, Patrick)
April 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Danica B. Denny to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5396472), filed by Defendant AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Denny, Danica)
April 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lauren A. Guichard to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5396470), filed by Defendant AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guichard, Lauren)
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01172. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 **PLEASE DISREGARD. CASE MISTAKENLY TRANSFERRED TO INCORRECT DISTRICT.** Receipt of Transfer Case to Southern District of Illinois (my) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] Modified on 4/11/2019 (LBT).
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING #5 MOTION to to transfer venue. Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana, New Albany Division. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/8/2019.(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by American Commercial Barge Line LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/2/2019. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, To Transfer Venue by American Commercial Barge Line LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Guichard, Lauren) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge Division. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge Division 3 Magistrate Judge Dana M. Douglas. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jeremy Joost re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5)(Taylor, Ian) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/20/2019.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. **Document contains incorrect name of Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by American Commercial Barge Line LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)Attorney Lauren A. Guichard added to party American Commercial Barge Line LLC(pty:dft).(Guichard, Lauren) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED SEAMAN COMPLAINT against American Commercial Barge Line LLC filed by Jeremy Joost.(Aamodt, Jodi) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Commercial Barge Line LLC. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT against American Commercial Barge Line LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7413379) filed by Jeremy Joost. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Jodi Jacobs Aamodt added to party Jeremy Joost(pty:pla).(Aamodt, Jodi) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOOST v. AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Pontier Rice
Represented By: Lauren A. Guichard
Represented By: Patrick J. McShane
Represented By: Danica B. Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY JOOST
Represented By: Jodi Jacobs Aamodt
Represented By: Ian F. Taylor
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Stanley Joseph Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?