ENGLAND et al v. MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC

Plaintiff: RACHEL ENGLAND and NICHOLAS ENGLAND
Defendant: MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00110
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Levi, Nicholas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Levi, Nicholas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ward Levi on behalf of Defendant MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Levi, Nicholas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by NICHOLAS ENGLAND, RACHEL ENGLAND. MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC waiver sent on 5/22/2019. (Volheim, Nathan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (LBT)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC. (MAT)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Coleman on behalf of Plaintiffs NICHOLAS ENGLAND, RACHEL ENGLAND. (Coleman, Eric)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Plaintiffs NICHOLAS ENGLAND, RACHEL ENGLAND. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim on behalf of Plaintiffs NICHOLAS ENGLAND, RACHEL ENGLAND. (Volheim, Nathan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC, filed by NICHOLAS ENGLAND, RACHEL ENGLAND. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5437901) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Volheim, Nathan) Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit docket text to reflect proposed summons filed (MAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENGLAND et al v. MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL ENGLAND
Represented By: Nathan C. Volheim
Represented By: Eric D. Coleman
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS ENGLAND
Represented By: Nathan C. Volheim
Represented By: Eric D. Coleman
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Ward Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?