EDWARDS v. DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC.

Plaintiff: CATHY R. EDWARDS
Defendant: DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00111
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Roth, Brian)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC..(Roth, Brian)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Roth on behalf of Defendant DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Roth, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey B. McCarrell on behalf of Plaintiff CATHY R. EDWARDS. (McCarrell, Geoffrey)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by CATHY R. EDWARDS. DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC. waiver sent on 5/21/2019. (Chaet, H.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC. (MAT)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Klain on behalf of Plaintiff CATHY R. EDWARDS. (Klain, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Joshua Chaet on behalf of Plaintiff CATHY R. EDWARDS. (Chaet, H.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC., filed by CATHY R. EDWARDS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5440507) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Credit Report, #2 Exhibit B-Payment Portal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Chaet, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDWARDS v. DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, INC.
Represented By: Brian D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHY R. EDWARDS
Represented By: H. Joshua Chaet
Represented By: David S. Klain
Represented By: Geoffrey B. McCarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?