AMERICAN ROOFING & METAL COMPANY, INC. v. LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: AMERICAN ROOFING & METAL COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Case Number: 4:2019cv00215
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Counter Defendant AMERICAN ROOFING & METAL COMPANY, INC. . (Senn, Matthew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 Lawrenceburg Community School Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against AMERICAN ROOFING & METAL COMPANY, INC., filed by LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Olsen, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Chase Olsen on behalf of Defendant LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Olsen, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Kramer Ricchiuto on behalf of Defendant LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Ricchiuto, Anne)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thurman Senn on behalf of Plaintiff AMERICAN ROOFING & METAL COMPANY, INC.. (Senn, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 9:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/31/2019.(TMC)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Weldon, Delmar)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Delmar D. Weldon, III on behalf of Defendant LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Weldon, Delmar)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (TMC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (TMC)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN ROOFING & METAL COMPANY, INC.. (Otten, Charles)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Joseph Otten on behalf of Plaintiff AMERICAN ROOFING & METAL COMPANY, INC.. (Otten, Charles)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5674641) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - May 20th Rejection Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - June 7th Response Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Otten, Charles) Modified on 10/15/2019 to correct docket text (TMC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN ROOFING & METAL COMPANY, INC. v. LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCEBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: Delmar D. Weldon, III
Represented By: Anne Kramer Ricchiuto
Represented By: Matthew Chase Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN ROOFING & METAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Charles Joseph Otten
Represented By: Matthew Thurman Senn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?