HAINES v. BLITON et al
Plaintiff: JAREL T. HAINES
Defendant: JASON BLITON and KENNY FREEMAN
Case Number: 4:2019cv00245
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through February 3, 2020, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Letter re #1 Complaint from Jarel Haines. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TMC).
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JAREL T. HAINES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through December 30, 2019, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Caren L. Pollack on behalf of Defendants JASON BLITON, KENNY FREEMAN. (Pollack, Caren)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by US Mail. (MEH)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENTRY SCREENING COMPLAINT, SEVERING CLAIMS, AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF PROCESS -This action shall proceed with claims against Defendants Ponsler and Bliton. The clerk is directed to issue process to Defendants (1) Jason Bliton and (2) Evan Ponsler. Process shall consist of the complaint (dkt. 1 ), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. The clerk is directed to update the docket to reflect that Defendants Ponsler and Bliton are the only defendants in the action and terminate all other defendants. Mr. Haines' diet claim is severed, and the clerk is directed to open a new civil. The claims discussed in Part III(C) are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. If the Plaintiff believes he asserted additional claims not discussed in Part III, he shall have through 12/16/2019, to notify the Court (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/21/2019.(TMC)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JASON BLITON, KENNY FREEMAN, filed by JAREL T. HAINES. (No fee paid with this filing) (TMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAINES v. BLITON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON BLITON
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNY FREEMAN
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAREL T. HAINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?