AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC v. LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC
Plaintiff: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC and Louis Dreyfus Company LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00274
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice is GRANTED. Attorney Jay D. Koehn for LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Jay D. Koehn register as a user of the courts electronic case filing system by 2/25/2020. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/12/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice is GRANTED. Attorney Patrick D. Pepper for LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Patrick D. Pepper register as a user of the courts electronic case filing system by 2/25/2020. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/12/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jay D. Koehn to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5852645), filed by Defendant LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Jay D. Koehn, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Drummy, William)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patrick D. Pepper to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5852643), filed by Defendant LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Patrick D. Pepper, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Drummy, William)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC identifying Corporate Parent Louis Dreyfus Company LLC for LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC.. (Drummy, William)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue , filed by Defendant LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Freight Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Confirmation of Purchase 11-22-19, #3 Exhibit C - Confirmation of Purchase 9-30-19)(Drummy, William)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue , filed by Defendant LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC. (Drummy, William)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendant LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC. (Drummy, William)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Drummy on behalf of Defendant LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC. (Drummy, William)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service - by AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC. Louis Dreyfus Company, LLC served on 12/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proof of Service) (Kelly, Donald) Modified on 12/31/2019 to correct docket text (TMC).
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC. (LBT)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean G. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC. (Williamson, Sean)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J. Kelly on behalf of Plaintiff AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC. (Kelly, Donald)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC identifying Corporate Parent COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE COMPANY for AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC.. (Kelly, Donald)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis Dreyfus Company LLC, filed by AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5772901) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kelly, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC v. LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE LLC
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Represented By: Sean G. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Dreyfus Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?