JAILANI v. QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Plaintiff: AWEIS JAILANI
Defendant: QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00055
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Regarding Discovery Disputes - Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(1) and S.D. Ind. L.R. 37-1(a), counsel must confer in good faith to resolve a discovery dispute before involving the court in the dispute (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/17/2020.(TMC)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by counsel on 4/9/2020 for an initial pretrial conference. Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2021. Discovery due by 1/4/2021 (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/10/2020.(TMC)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on April 9, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on June 26, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
April 8, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC.(Craig, Darren)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court , filed by Plaintiff AWEIS JAILANI. (Riley, William) Modified on 4/7/2020 to edit text(TMC).
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 Parties' Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff AWEIS JAILANI . (Riley, William)
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court , filed by Defendant QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Craig, Darren)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric K. Habig on behalf of Plaintiff AWEIS JAILANI. (Habig, Eric)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Plaintiff AWEIS JAILANI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, William)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/17/2020.(TMC)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Baker on behalf of Defendant QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Baker, Eric)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE CORRECTED NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF TIME, filed by Defendant QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC, re #6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time. (Craig, Darren)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Craig, Darren)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal served on Dearborn County Court Clerk, Jeff Beck, William N. Riley, et. al on March 4, 2020, filed by QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit File-Stamped Copy of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Craig, Darren)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Craig, Darren)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Andrew Craig on behalf of Defendant QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Craig, Darren)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dearborn Circuit Court, case number 15C01-2002-PL-000013, filed by QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5889926) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit February 4, 2020 Complaint, #2 State Court Record State Court Docket Sheet, Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, Exhibit A to Complaint, Appearance - E. Habig, Appearance - W. Riley and A. Lowe, Summons to QFS Transportation, LLC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Craig, Darren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAILANI v. QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Represented By: Darren Andrew Craig
Represented By: Eric A. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AWEIS JAILANI
Represented By: Eric K. Habig
Represented By: William N. Riley
Represented By: Anne Medlin Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?