DEDRICK et al v. SHERIFF DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: BRETT BACHELDER, WESLEY ROBERTSON, AARON SHIRLEY, SEAN A. DEDRICK, WILLIAM BALLRD, CLINTON BRANHAM and JEREMY HAZEL
Defendant: FRANK LOOP, FUREMAN, KEITH HENDERSON, DEPUTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEYS and SHERIFF DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 4:2020cv00081
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff SEAN A. DEDRICK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED to the extent that the Shirley is assessed an initial partial filing fee Fifty-Two Dollars and Twenty-Three Cents ($52.23). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through June 26, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The plaintiff is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding months income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/1/2020 (Copies mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED to the extent that the Bachelder is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Thirty-Three Dollars and Fifty Cents ($33.50). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through June 26, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The plaintiff is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding months income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/1/2020 (Copies mailed per distribution list) (TMC)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED to the extent that the Dedrick is assessed an initial partial filing fee Forty-Three Dollars and Seventy-Two Cents ($43.72). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through June 26, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The plaintiff is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding months income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/1/2020 (Copies mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #12 Motion to Appoint Counsel and #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel are DENIED as premature (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/27/2020 (CopiEs mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 Submission of Trust Account Summary, filed by Plaintiff SEAN A. DEDRICK. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Summary, #2 Envelope)(TMC)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff AARON SHIRLEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff AARON SHIRLEY. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(TMC)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff BRETT BACHELDER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff BRETT BACHELDER. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(TMC)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 Letter Regarding Trust Account Summary from Sean Dedrick. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TMC)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff SEAN A. DEDRICK. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(TMC)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff SEAN A. DEDRICK. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(TMC)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #4 Entry and Blank Form sent to JEREMY HAZEL FLOYD COUNTY JAIL P.O. Box 1406 New Albany, IN 47150. Return to sender - not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (TMC) Modified on 5/13/2020 - no new address reported(TMC).
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #3 Notice to Pro se Litigant sent to JEREMY HAZEL Floyd County Jail P.O. Box 1406 New Albany, IN 47150. Return to sender - attempted, not known. Unable to forward. (TMC)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Entry On Joint Litigation by Prisoners, Filing Fees, and Request for Counsel - each plaintiff shall have through 5/18/2020, to notify the Court whether he would like to voluntarily dismiss this action without prejudice or proceed. If a plaintiff fails to notify the court in the time provided, the Court may dismiss his claims without further warning or opportunity to show cause. Each plaintiff shall also have through 5/18/2020, to either pay the $400 filing fee or file an individualized motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is directed to include a form motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with each plaintiffs copy of this Entry. For the present, the plaintiffs request for assistance with recruiting counsel is denied. The clerk shall include a copy of the Courts form Motion for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel with each plaintiffs copy of this Entry(See Entry). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/17/2020 (Copies mailed to Plaintiff's per distribution list). (Attachments: #1 IFP Form, #2 Recruit Counsel Form)(TMC)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copies distributed to Plaintiff's via US mail. (TMC)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPUTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEYS, FUREMAN, KEITH HENDERSON, FRANK LOOP, SHERIFF DEPARTMENT, filed by CLINTON BRANHAM, AARON SHIRLEY, WESLEY ROBERTSON, BRETT BACHELDER, WILLIAM BALLRD, SEAN A. DEDRICK, JEREMY HAZEL. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEDRICK et al v. SHERIFF DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT BACHELDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON SHIRLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN A. DEDRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM BALLRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLINTON BRANHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY HAZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK LOOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUREMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?