SPEARS v. SIMS et al
Plaintiff: TERRI SPEARS
Defendant: COLEMAN AMERICAN MOVING SERVICES, INC. and ROBERT SIMS
Case Number: 4:2020cv00092
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2021 at 9:30 AM in room #200, United States Courthouse, 121 W. Spring Street, New Albany, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. PLEASE NOTE THE INDIANAPOLIS LOCATION OF THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/10/2020.(TMC)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Regarding Discovery Disputes - Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(1) and S.D. Ind. L.R. 37-1(a), counsel must confer in good faith to resolve a discovery dispute before involving the court in the dispute (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/5/2020.(TMC)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by counsel on 5/27/2020 for an initial pretrial conference. Discovery due by 8/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/1/2020.(TMC)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on May 27, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this caseis approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on July 16, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants COLEMAN AMERICAN MOVING SERVICES, INC., ROBERT SIMS . (Hoy, Jason)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/24/2020.(TMC)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLEMAN AMERICAN MOVING SERVICES, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Coleman World Group, LLC for COLEMAN AMERICAN MOVING SERVICES, INC... (Whitten, Christopher)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J. Hoy on behalf of Defendants COLEMAN AMERICAN MOVING SERVICES, INC., ROBERT SIMS. (Hoy, Jason)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Whitten on behalf of Defendants COLEMAN AMERICAN MOVING SERVICES, INC., ROBERT SIMS. (Whitten, Christopher)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson Superior Court, case number 36D01-2002-CT-000025, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5966283) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Requests for Admission, #2 State Court Record Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, Appearance, Summonses, Return of Service for Defendant Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., Defendants' Appearance, Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer Complaint, Order on Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time, Plaintiff's Motion for Pre-Trial Conference, Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Date, Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Mediate, Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Pre-Trial Conference, Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Mediate, and Defendants' Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Trial by Jury, #3 Exhibit copy of Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Christopher) Modified on 4/24/2020 to edit text(TMC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPEARS v. SIMS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI SPEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLEMAN AMERICAN MOVING SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Jason J. Hoy
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT SIMS
Represented By: Jason J. Hoy
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?